Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Constellation Healthcare Technologies Inc. And Certain Of Their Affiliates, Howard M. Ehrenberg In His Capacity As Liquidating Trustee Of The Liquidating Trust Agreement By And Among Orion Healthcorp Inc., filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Sorensen Stephen Paul, against Kpmg Llp., represented by Rudolph Amelia Toy, Shelton Ian Scott, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Holly J. Fujie presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHolly J. Fujie Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 23, 2019 |
CategoryOther Non-Personal Injury/Property Damage Tort (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order re:170.6) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-11-07T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application; Filed by: KPMG, LLP. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-12-05T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: KPMG, LLP. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-12-05T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: KPMG, LLP. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-02-05T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-10-25T00:00:00Motion for Stay of Proceedings; Filed by: KPMG, LLP. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-12-05T00:00:00Other - Ruling Re Submitted Matter (Motion for Stay); Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-02-11T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-10-23T00:00:00Notice of Related Case; Filed by: KPMG, LLP. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-12-05T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-10-25T00:00:00Declaration of Ian S. Shelton in Support; Filed by: KPMG, LLP. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-12-05T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-01-10T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-11-14T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: KPMG, LLP. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-12-05T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-11-07T00:00:00Status Report; Filed by: KPMG, LLP. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-06-30T00:00:00Status Report JOINT STATUS CONFERENCE REPORT; Filed by: KPMG, LLP. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-10-13T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Appearance Case Review re: Renewal of Pro Hac Vice) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-01-11T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Appearance Case Review Renewal of Pro Hac Vice) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-02-16T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-10-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-10-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Renewal of Pro Hac Vice)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-02-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-02-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter Re: Motion for Stay of the Action)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-02-11T00:00:00Notice of Related Case Filed by KPMG, LLP. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-12-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Notice of Continuance of Hearing(s) Due to C...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-04-28T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by KPMG, LLP. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-12-05T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-01-10T00:00:00Minute Order ((Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-12-11T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by KPMG, LLP. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-02-05T00:00:00Declaration (of Ian S. Shelton in Support) Filed by KPMG, LLP. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-12-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Granting Ex...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-12-09T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review re: Renewal of Pro Hac Vice) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-01-11T00:00:00Other - (Ruling Re Submitted Matter (Motion for Stay)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-02-11T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by KPMG, LLP. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-12-05T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by KPMG, LLP. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-12-05T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-11-14T00:00:00Status Report (JOINT STATUS CONFERENCE REPORT) Filed by KPMG, LLP. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-10-13T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-11-07T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-10-25T00:00:00Minute Order ((Non-Appearance Case Review re: Renewal of Pro Hac Vice)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-01-11T00:00:00Status Report Filed by KPMG, LLP. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-06-30T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re:170.6) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-11-07T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-10-25T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review Renewal of Pro Hac Vice) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-02-16T00:00:00Minute Order ((Hearing on Motion for Stay of Proceedings (Res ID: 5171))) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-01-10T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application Filed by KPMG, LLP. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-12-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for Extension of Responsive P...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-12-06T00:00:00Motion for Stay of Proceedings ((Res ID: 5171)) Filed by KPMG, LLP. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-12-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re:170.6)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-11-07T00:00:00Minute Order ((Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-07-07T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service
Date: 2019-10-25T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2019-10-23T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2019-11-01T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)
Date: 2019-11-06T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re:170.6) of 11/07/2019)
Date: 2019-11-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re:170.6))
Date: 2019-11-07T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2019-10-25T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2019-10-23T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2019-10-23T00:00:00Declaration (in support of motion for peremptory challenge)
Date: 2019-11-06T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2019-10-23T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings
Date: 2019-11-07T00:00:00Opposition (opposition to defendants motion for stay)
Date: 2019-12-27T00:00:00Minute Order ((Status Conference))
Date: 2020-12-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Granting Ex...))
Date: 2019-12-09T00:00:00Other - (Ruling Re Submitted Matter (Motion for Stay))
Date: 2020-02-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference))
Date: 2020-10-14T00:00:00Declaration (of Ian S. Shelton in Support)
Date: 2019-12-05T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (for Extension of Responsive Pleading Deadline by Defendant KPMG LLP)
Date: 2019-12-05T00:00:00Minute Order ((Hearing on Motion for Stay of Proceedings (Res ID: 5171)))
Date: 2020-01-10T00:00:00Application to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice ((Res ID: 8133))
Date: 2019-12-20T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application
Date: 2019-12-05T00:00:00Status Report (JOINT STATUS CONFERENCE REPORT)
Date: 2020-12-08T00:00:00Notice of Related Case
Date: 2019-12-05T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2020-01-10T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2019-12-05T00:00:00Status Report
Date: 2020-06-30T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-02-05T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-02-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter Re: Motion for Stay of the Action))
Date: 2020-02-11T00:00:00Motion for Stay of Proceedings ((Res ID: 5171))
Date: 2019-12-05T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2019-12-05T00:00:00Minute Order ((Status Conference))
Date: 2020-07-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for Extension of Responsive P...))
Date: 2019-12-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Notice of Continuance of Hearing(s) Due to C...))
Date: 2020-04-28T00:00:00Status Report (JOINT STATUS CONFERENCE REPORT)
Date: 2020-10-13T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2019-11-14T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review re: Renewal of Pro Hac Vice) of 01/11/2021)
Date: 2021-01-11T00:00:00Minute Order ((Non-Appearance Case Review re: Renewal of Pro Hac Vice))
Date: 2021-01-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Renewal of Pro Hac Vice))
Date: 2021-02-16T00:00:00Status Report
Date: 2021-02-22T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review Renewal of Pro Hac Vice) of 02/16/2021)
Date: 2021-02-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference))
Date: 2020-12-11T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2019-12-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Stay of Proceedings (Res ID: 5171)))
Date: 2020-01-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference))
Date: 2020-07-07T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.