Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Sapir Eric, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Sapir Eric, against Southwestern Law School Fka Southwestern University School Of Law, represented by Warshaw Robert, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Holly J. Fujie presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHolly J. Fujie Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateOctober 22, 2019 |
CategoryFraud (No Contract) (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Case Cycle Time73 days |
Complaint
Date: October 22, 2019Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: October 22, 2019Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: October 22, 2019Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service
Date: 2019-10-24T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2019-10-22T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: October 30, 2019Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2019-10-22T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2019-10-22T00:00:00Answer (DEFENDANT SOUTHWESTERN LAW SCHOOL'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT)
Date: December 16, 2019Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2019-10-24T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: January 03, 2020For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.