Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Team Enterprises Dba New Team Llc, filed a(n) Other Complaint (Non-Tort/Non-Complex) (General Jurisdiction) case represented by Weissman William Hays, against Hilliard Sharon, represented by Mathews Suman, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Rafael A. Ongkeko presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRafael A. Ongkeko Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management123 days |
Filing DateOctober 21, 2019 |
CategoryOther Complaint (Non-Tort/Non-Complex) (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 06, 2023 |
||
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
||
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: October 21, 2019Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: October 21, 2019Complaint
Date: October 21, 2019Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-10-25T00:00:00Declaration of William Hays Weissman; Filed by: TEAM ENTERPRISES (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-04-20T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Sharon Hilliard (Defendant)
Date: 2020-04-14T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: Sharon Hilliard (Defendant); As to: TEAM ENTERPRISES (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-02-25T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: TEAM ENTERPRISES (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-02-14T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: TEAM ENTERPRISES (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-28T00:00:00Summons to 1st Amended Complaint; Issued and Filed by: TEAM ENTERPRISES (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-01-09T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-10-21T00:00:00Amended Complaint (1st); Filed by: TEAM ENTERPRISES (Plaintiff); As to: Sharon Hilliard (Defendant)
Date: 2020-01-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-09-29T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Sharon Hilliard (Defendant)
Date: May 03, 2021Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-03-26T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by TEAM ENTERPRISES (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-28T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Sharon Hilliard (Defendant)
Date: 2021-05-03T00:00:00Amended Complaint (1st) Filed by TEAM ENTERPRISES (Plaintiff); TEAM ENTERPRISES (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-01-09T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-10-21T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-10-25T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by TEAM ENTERPRISES (Plaintiff)
Date: May 05, 2021Declaration (of William Hays Weissman) Filed by TEAM ENTERPRISES (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-04-20T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-03-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Notice of Continuance of Hearing(s) Due to C...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-04-16T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by TEAM ENTERPRISES (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-11-08T00:00:00Minute Order ((Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-12-09T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by TEAM ENTERPRISES (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-04-20T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Sharon Hilliard (Defendant)
Date: 2020-04-14T00:00:00Answer Filed by Sharon Hilliard (Defendant)
Date: 2020-02-25T00:00:00Summons (to 1st Amended Complaint) Filed by TEAM ENTERPRISES (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-01-09T00:00:00Complaint Filed by TEAM ENTERPRISES (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-10-21T00:00:00Minute Order ((Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-02-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement))) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-04-27T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by TEAM ENTERPRISES (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-10-21T00:00:00Minute Order ((Order to Show Cause Re: Sanctions Against Plaintiff/Plaintiff...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-06-30T00:00:00Minute Order ((Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-01-25T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by TEAM ENTERPRISES (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-28T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by TEAM ENTERPRISES (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-02-14T00:00:00Minute Order ((Case Management Conference))
Date: 2020-12-09T00:00:00Minute Order ((Case Management Conference))
Date: 2020-02-21T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2019-10-25T00:00:00Notice ( of Order to Show Cause RE Sanctions and Continued Case Management Conference)
Date: 2020-02-24T00:00:00Minute Order ((Case Management Conference))
Date: 2021-01-25T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-04-20T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-09-28T00:00:00Declaration (of William Hays Weissman)
Date: 2020-04-20T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-09-28T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-02-25T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2021-03-26T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) (proof of electronic service)
Date: 2021-04-05T00:00:00Minute Order ((Order to Show Cause Re: Sanctions Against Plaintiff/Plaintiff...))
Date: 2020-06-30T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2019-11-08T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2019-10-21T00:00:00Amended Complaint (1st)
Date: 2020-01-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2020-09-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Notice of Continuance of Hearing(s) Due to C...))
Date: 2020-04-16T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2019-10-21T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2019-10-21T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-04-14T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-02-14T00:00:00Summons (to 1st Amended Complaint)
Date: 2020-01-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2020-12-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Sanctions Against Plaintiff/Plaintiff...))
Date: 2020-06-30T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.