Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Amazon Capital Services Inc. A Delaware Corporation, filed a(n) Contractual Fraud - Commercial case represented by Phillis Nicole S., against Moriel Jason, Share Association A California Limited Liability Company, Wares N' More Llc. A California Limited Liability Company, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Stephanie M. Bowick presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeStephanie M. Bowick Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 21, 2019 |
CategoryContractual Fraud (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 04, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeContractual Fraud |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-10-25T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Amazon Capital Services, Inc., a Delaware corporation (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-08-18T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-12-23T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-10-21T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-03-27T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Case Management Conference) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-03-10T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-08-21T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Amazon Capital Services, Inc., a Delaware corporation (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-03-05T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-03-02T00:00:00Summary of the Case; Filed by: Amazon Capital Services, Inc., a Delaware corporation (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-02-28T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-04-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-03-02T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-03-27T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-10-21T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-08-21T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Case Management Conference) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-03-10T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by Amazon Capital Services, Inc., a Delaware corporation (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-10-21T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-12-23T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Filed by Amazon Capital Services, Inc., a Delaware corporation (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-11-05T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-10-25T00:00:00Notice of Rejection of Electronic Filing Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-02-03T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Amazon Capital Services, Inc., a Delaware corporation (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-08-18T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Amazon Capital Services, Inc., a Delaware corporation (Plaintiff) PROCEEDINGS HELD
Date: 2019-10-21T00:00:00Order for Publication Filed by Amazon Capital Services, Inc., a Delaware corporation (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-02-03T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by Amazon Capital Services, Inc., a Delaware corporation (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-10-21T00:00:00Summary of the Case Filed by Amazon Capital Services, Inc., a Delaware corporation (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-02-28T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-04-13T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Amazon Capital Services, Inc., a Delaware corporation (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-03-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: March 12, 2021Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-03-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-12-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-03-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-04-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-08-21T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration of Drew Maconachy in Support of Application for Publication)
Date: 2020-03-05T00:00:00Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt
Date: 2020-02-28T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2019-10-25T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2019-10-21T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2019-12-20T00:00:00Summary of the Case
Date: 2020-02-28T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 12/23/2019)
Date: 2019-12-23T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration of Non Service (Wares N' More, LLC))
Date: 2019-12-20T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration of Non Service (Jason Moriel))
Date: 2019-12-20T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2019-10-21T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2020-02-28T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2019-11-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2019-12-23T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (Ex Parte Application for Extension of Time to Serve Pleading)
Date: 2019-12-23T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2019-10-21T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2019-10-21T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-08-18T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 03/02/2021)
Date: 2021-03-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2021-03-10T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 08/21/2020)
Date: 2020-08-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-04-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2021-03-02T00:00:00Notice (of Continuance of Case Management Conference Hearing)
Date: 2020-08-25T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration of Nicole Phillis in Support of Application for Publication)
Date: 2020-03-05T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 04/13/2020)
Date: 2020-04-13T00:00:00Notice (of Continuance of Case Management Conference Hearing)
Date: 2020-04-22T00:00:00Order for Publication
Date: 2021-02-03T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment
Date: 2020-03-27T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2020-03-20T00:00:00Motion re: (for Order for Service by Delivery to Secretary of State)
Date: 2020-08-19T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2020-08-18T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-03-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-08-21T00:00:00Notice of Rejection of Electronic Filing
Date: 2021-02-03T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Case Management Conference) of 03/10/2021)
Date: 2021-03-10T00:00:00Application (Application for Publication)
Date: 2020-03-05T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.