Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Aminizar Farhad, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Kaloustian Harry S, against Mercedes-Benz Usa Llc A Delaware Limited Liability Company, Sonic Calabasas M Inc. A California Corporation Dba Mercedes Benz Of Calabasas, represented by Oaks Ashley, Tarczy Benjamin, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Steven J. Kleifield presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSteven J. Kleifield Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management120 days |
Filing DateOctober 21, 2019 |
CategoryOther Breach Of Contract/Warranty (Not Fraud Or Negligence) (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Case Cycle Time120 days |
Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-11-04T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-10-21T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2019-10-21T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2019-10-21T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2019-10-21T00:00:00Notice (MBUSA's Notice to Adverse Parties)
Date: 2019-12-05T00:00:00Notice (MBUSA's Notice of Stay)
Date: 2019-12-05T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2019-10-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: February 18, 2020Answer
Date: 2019-11-20T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2019-12-02T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2019-11-04T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: February 18, 2020For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.