Case Last Refreshed: 3 weeks ago
Quinones Monica, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case represented by Messrelian Harout, against Vca Inc., Vicar Operating Inc., represented by David Lindsay C., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Michael P. Linfield presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMichael P. Linfield Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management134 days |
Filing DateOctober 21, 2019 |
CategoryOther Employment Complaint Case (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 04, 2024 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-10-21T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Monica Quinones (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-02-14T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-11-06T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Monica Quinones (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-02-14T00:00:00Declaration OF HAROUT MESSRELIAN; Filed by: Monica Quinones (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-05-11T00:00:00Status Report; Filed by: Monica Quinones (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-02-22T00:00:00Declaration of Monica Quinones; Filed by: Monica Quinones (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-05-11T00:00:00Declaration of Jonathan Paul; Filed by: Monica Quinones (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-05-11T00:00:00Joint Status Conference Report; Filed by: VCA, Inc. (Defendant); Vicar Operating, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-12-10T00:00:00Motion re: FOR APPROVAL OF PAGA SETTLEMENT AND RELEASE; Filed by: Monica Quinones (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-05-11T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Appearance Case Review) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: June 08, 2022Order (PROPOSED) ORDER; Filed by: Monica Quinones (Plaintiff)
Date: June 08, 2022Complaint
Date: 2019-10-21T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Hearing on Motion - Other Motion to Approve Settlement and Di...) of )
Date: 2021-08-27T00:00:00Amended Complaint (1st)
Date: 2020-02-25T00:00:00Motion re: (FOR APPROVAL OF PAGA SETTLEMENT AND RELEASE)
Date: 2022-05-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion - Other Motion to Approve Settlement and Di...))
Date: 2021-04-30T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2020-02-14T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-08-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion - Other Motion to Approve Settlement and Di...))
Date: 2021-08-27T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2019-11-06T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2019-10-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Further Status Conference re: PAGA Settlement))
Date: 2021-12-20T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2019-10-21T00:00:00Status Report
Date: 2022-02-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Further Status Conference re: PAGA Settlement; Hearing on Mot...))
Date: 2022-05-31T00:00:00Declaration (OF HAROUT MESSRELIAN IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR APPROVAL OF PAGA SETTLEMENT AND RELEASE)
Date: 2021-04-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Further Status Conference re: PAGA Settlement))
Date: 2022-02-28T00:00:00Declaration (of Monica Quinones)
Date: 2022-05-11T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (A WAIVER OF DISQUALIFICATION STIPUALTION; AND [PROPOSED] ORDER)
Date: 2021-05-11T00:00:00Motion re: (FOR APPROVAL OF PAGA SETTLEMENT AND RELEASE)
Date: 2021-04-08T00:00:00Declaration (OF HAROUT MESSRELIAN)
Date: 2022-05-11T00:00:00Declaration (of Jonathan Paul)
Date: 2022-05-11T00:00:00Joint Status Conference Report
Date: 2021-12-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2020-03-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference))
Date: 2020-11-17T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-02-14T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2019-10-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion - Other Motion to Approve Settlement and Di...))
Date: 2021-05-14T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Hearing on Motion - Other Motion to Approve Settlement and Di...) of )
Date: 2021-05-14T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2019-10-21T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (A WAIVER OF DISQUALIFICATION STIPUALTION; AND [PROPOSED] ORDER)
Date: 2021-05-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference))
Date: 2020-11-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2020-03-03T00:00:00Motion re: (FOR APPROVAL OF PAGA SETTLEMENT AND RELEASE)
Date: 2021-04-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion - Other Motion to Approve Settlement and Di...))
Date: 2021-04-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion - Other Motion to Approve Settlement and Di...))
Date: 2021-05-14T00:00:00Declaration (OF HAROUT MESSRELIAN IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR APPROVAL OF PAGA SETTLEMENT AND RELEASE)
Date: 2021-04-08T00:00:00Amended Complaint (1st)
Date: 2020-02-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Further Status Conference re: PAGA Settlement))
Date: 2021-12-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Further Status Conference re: PAGA Settlement))
Date: 2022-02-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion - Other Motion to Approve Settlement and Di...))
Date: 2021-08-27T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.