Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Capital One Bank Usa N.A., filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Kennard Robert S. Esq., against Reddicks Matthew, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Richard J. Burdge Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRichard J. Burdge Jr. Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateOctober 18, 2019 |
CategoryOther Promissory Note/Collections Case (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Case Cycle Time180 days |
Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: October 18, 2019Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: October 18, 2019Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: October 18, 2019Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2019-10-18T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: October 31, 2019Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2019-10-18T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: April 15, 2020Declaration (Declaration of Non-Service)
Date: October 30, 2019Complaint
Date: 2019-10-18T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([Notice of Case Management Conference])
Date: October 31, 2019Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2019-10-18T00:00:00Declaration (of Non-Service)
Date: October 29, 2019For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.