Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Carter Michael, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case represented by Stolar Steven, against Davis An Individual Vincent W, Vincent W. Davis & Associates A Professional Organization, represented by Folke Duane R, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Stuart M. Rice presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeStuart M. Rice Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management120 days |
Filing DateOctober 21, 2019 |
CategoryLegal Malpractice (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-10-21T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Michael Carter (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-22T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-11-12T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-10-23T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Michael Carter (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-02-14T00:00:00Order RULING; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-12-14T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-09-30T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-02-01T00:00:00Request for Dismissal; Filed by: Michael Carter (Plaintiff)
Date: June 30, 2022Exhibit List; Filed by: Vincent W Davis, an individual (Defendant)
Date: 2022-01-19T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Vincent W. Davis & Associates, a professional organization (Defendant)
Date: 2022-01-18T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-10-14T00:00:00Notice of Settlement; Filed by: Michael Carter (Plaintiff); Vacate Future Dates: No
Date: 2022-01-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-02-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: sanctions against plaintiff for failu...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-06-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-10-06T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service Filed by Michael Carter (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-06-15T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Michael Carter (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-10-21T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by Michael Carter (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-10-21T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-10-23T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail Filed by Michael Carter (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-10-02T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Michael Carter (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-22T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-10-21T00:00:00Declaration re: Due Diligence Filed by Michael Carter (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-06-15T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-11-12T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Michael Carter (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-02-14T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by Michael Carter (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-10-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-02-01T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail Filed by Michael Carter (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-10-25T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-10-14T00:00:00Notice (of Case Reassignment) Filed by Michael Carter (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-10-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement); Order to Show...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-06-30T00:00:00Exhibit List Filed by Vincent W Davis, an individual (Defendant)
Date: 2022-01-19T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-09-30T00:00:00Order (RULING) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-12-14T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by Michael Carter (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-06-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (1) Order to Show Cause Re: sanctions against plaintiff for fa...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-12-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement))) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-04-13T00:00:00Notice of Settlement Filed by Michael Carter (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-01-26T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-02-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (HEARING ON MOTION - OTHER RE: ANY POST ARBITRATION ISSUES (RE...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-10-04T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed by Vincent W. Davis & Associates, a professional organization (Defendant)
Date: 2022-01-18T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2019-10-21T00:00:00Exhibit List
Date: 2022-01-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2020-02-18T00:00:00Reply (to Brief with memorandum of points and authorities...)
Date: 2020-11-18T00:00:00Declaration (of Duane R. Folke, Esq. in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment)
Date: 2022-01-18T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Order to Show Cause Re: sanctions against plaintiff for failu...) of )
Date: 2020-06-29T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2020-09-22T00:00:00Declaration (in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment)
Date: 2022-01-18T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-10-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review))
Date: 2022-02-01T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-09-22T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2020-10-02T00:00:00Notice of Settlement
Date: 2022-01-26T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2019-10-23T00:00:00Declaration (DECLARATION IN RESPONSE TO OSC FOR FAILURE TO APPEAR AT CMC)
Date: 2020-10-02T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2019-10-21T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-02-14T00:00:00Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)
Date: 2020-06-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (HEARING ON MOTION - OTHER RE: ANY POST ARBITRATION ISSUES (RE...))
Date: 2021-10-04T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2020-11-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (1) Order to Show Cause Re: sanctions against plaintiff for fa...))
Date: 2020-12-14T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: 2022-01-18T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2019-10-21T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2021-09-30T00:00:00Declaration re: Due Diligence
Date: 2020-06-15T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((HEARING ON MOTION - OTHER RE: ANY POST ARBITRATION ISSUES (RE...) of )
Date: 2021-10-04T00:00:00Motion to Compel (Arbitration pursuant to the Applicable Retainer Agreement)
Date: 2020-07-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-10-06T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2019-10-21T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2022-01-18T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2020-06-15T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2020-07-14T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2021-10-14T00:00:00Notice (of Case Reassignment)
Date: 2021-10-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: sanctions against plaintiff for failu...))
Date: 2020-06-29T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service
Date: 2022-02-01T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2021-10-25T00:00:00Order (RULING)
Date: 2020-12-14T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2020-12-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement)))
Date: 2022-04-13T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2019-10-21T00:00:00Reply (to Brief with memorandum of points and authorities...)
Date: 2020-11-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: sanctions against plaintiff for failu...))
Date: 2020-06-29T00:00:00Motion to Compel (Arbitration pursuant to the Applicable Retainer Agreement)
Date: 2020-07-14T00:00:00Declaration (DECLARATION IN RESPONSE TO OSC FOR FAILURE TO APPEAR AT CMC)
Date: 2020-10-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-10-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2020-02-18T00:00:00Order (RULING)
Date: 2020-12-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (1) Order to Show Cause Re: sanctions against plaintiff for fa...))
Date: 2020-12-14T00:00:00Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)
Date: 2020-06-15T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail Filed by Michael Carter (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-22T00:00:00Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service) Filed by Michael Carter (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-06-15T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.