Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Liu Cuijuan, filed a(n) Contractual Fraud - Commercial case represented by Wong Dixon, Young George, against Ann Vivian Ran An Individual, Dean T. Yang As Trustee Of The Yang Protection Trust, Efx Holdings Inc., Forex Group Inc., Intl Fcstone Inc. Aka Alter Ego Of Forex Group Inc., (total of 11) See All represented by Hwu Frank S, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Steven J. Kleifield presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSteven J. Kleifield Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management336 days |
Filing DateOctober 17, 2019 |
CategoryContractual Fraud (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeContractual Fraud |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Motion for Leave to Amend to Further Amend the Complaint; Filed by: CUIJUAN LIU (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-09-26T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: CUIJUAN LIU (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-03-28T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail; Filed by: CUIJUAN LIU (Plaintiff); As to: CUIJUAN LIU (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-04-28T00:00:00Motion to Continue the trial; Filed by: CUIJUAN LIU (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-05-17T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-12-09T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not initial pleading); Filed by: CUIJUAN LIU (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-08-10T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: CUIJUAN LIU (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-01T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: VIVIAN RAN ANN, an individual (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-02T00:00:00Summons on Complaint (3rd); Issued and Filed by: CUIJUAN LIU (Plaintiff); As to: CUIJUAN LIU (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-01-25T00:00:00; Default not entered as to EFX FINANCIAL, INC. On the Amended Complaint (2nd) filed by CUIJUAN LIU on
Date: 2023-06-22T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-06-22T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-10-22T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-03-18T00:00:00Status Conference Statement; Filed by: CUIJUAN LIU (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-09-26T00:00:00Case Management Statement Amended; Filed by: CUIJUAN LIU (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-10-19T00:00:00; Default not entered as to EFX HOLDINGS, INC. On the Amended Complaint (2nd) filed by CUIJUAN LIU on
Date: 2023-06-22T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-06-23T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: DAVID HAIBO YANG, an individual (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-02T00:00:00Status Conference Statement; Filed by: CUIJUAN LIU (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-05-16T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-02-08T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: DEAN TIANDA YANG, an individual (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-02T00:00:00Order re Demurrer to Complaint; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-09-17T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-10-17T00:00:00Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel; Filed by: Attorney; As to: CUIJUAN LIU (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-04-27T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-03-18T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: VIVIAN RAN ANN, an individual (Defendant)
Date: 2020-08-31T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: DAVID HAIBO YANG, an individual (Defendant)
Date: 2020-08-31T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: CUIJUAN LIU (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-16T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: DEAN TIANDA YANG, an individual (Defendant)
Date: 2020-08-31T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: CUIJUAN LIU (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-03-13T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-04-29T00:00:00; Default not entered as to WHT HOLDINGS, INC. On the Amended Complaint (2nd) filed by CUIJUAN LIU on
Date: 2023-06-21T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail; Filed by: CUIJUAN LIU (Plaintiff); As to: CUIJUAN LIU (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-04-27T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: CUIJUAN LIU (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-03-01T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: CUIJUAN LIU (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-06-01T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: CUIJUAN LIU (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-06-23T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Further Status Conference) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-04-13T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: CUIJUAN LIU (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-09-26T00:00:00; Default not entered as to EFX HOLDINGS, INC. On the Amended Complaint (2nd) filed by CUIJUAN LIU on
Date: 2023-06-21T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-08-18T00:00:00Request For Copies; Filed by: CUIJUAN LIU (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-06-29T00:00:00; Default not entered as to EFX FINANCIAL, INC. On the Amended Complaint (2nd) filed by CUIJUAN LIU on
Date: 2023-06-21T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Further Status Conference) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-05-17T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: CUIJUAN LIU (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-08-10T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-08-10T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-05-17T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: CUIJUAN LIU (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-06-22T00:00:00; Default not entered as to WHT HOLDINGS, INC. On the Amended Complaint (2nd) filed by CUIJUAN LIU on
Date: 2023-06-22T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: October 17, 2019Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: October 17, 2019Substitution of Attorney
Date: September 16, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITH MOTION...)
Date: September 17, 2020Order - ORDER RE DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT
Date: September 17, 2020Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: October 05, 2020Substitution of Attorney
Date: December 02, 2020Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment
Date: December 09, 2020Proof of Service by Mail
Date: April 27, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: January 07, 2021Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel
Date: April 27, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL)
Date: May 21, 2021Substitution of Attorney
Date: June 01, 2021Substitution of Attorney
Date: March 01, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: April 13, 2022Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: May 17, 2022Motion to Continue - MOTION TO CONTINUE THE TRIAL
Date: May 17, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: July 15, 2022Request for Judicial Notice
Date: September 26, 2022Status Conference Statement
Date: September 26, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: September 27, 2022Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (3RD)
Date: November 04, 2022Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (3RD)
Date: January 25, 2023Case Management Statement
Date: March 28, 2023Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: March 29, 2023Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment
Date: May 17, 2023Summons (on Complaint) Filed by CUIJUAN LIU (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-10-17T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-03-18T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-10-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-03-18T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed by DEAN TIANDA YANG, an individual (Defendant)
Date: 2020-08-31T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service Filed by CUIJUAN LIU (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-12-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-02-19T00:00:00Complaint Filed by CUIJUAN LIU (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-10-17T00:00:00Amended Complaint (1st) Filed by CUIJUAN LIU (Plaintiff); CUIJUAN LIU (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-03-13T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-10-22T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed by VIVIAN RAN ANN, an individual (Defendant)
Date: 2020-08-31T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-04-29T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed by DAVID HAIBO YANG, an individual (Defendant)
Date: 2020-08-31T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by CUIJUAN LIU (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-03-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-04-29T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-03-18T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Filed by CUIJUAN LIU (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-12-02T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by CUIJUAN LIU (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-10-17T00:00:00Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil Filed by Dixon Wong (Attorney)
Date: 2021-05-21T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail Filed by CUIJUAN LIU (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-05-21T00:00:00Order (re Demurrer to Complaint) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-09-17T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail Filed by Dixon Wong (Attorney)
Date: 2021-04-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Further Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-04-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Why Proof...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2023-01-26T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail Filed by CUIJUAN LIU (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-04-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-01-07T00:00:00Motion to Continue (the trial) Filed by CUIJUAN LIU (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-05-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Leave to Amend Plaintiff Cuijuan Liu's ...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-10-25T00:00:00Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel Filed by Dixon Wong (Attorney)
Date: 2021-04-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Further Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-05-17T00:00:00Status Conference Statement Filed by CUIJUAN LIU (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-09-26T00:00:00Motion for Leave to Amend (to Further Amend the Complaint) Filed by CUIJUAN LIU (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-09-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Continue Trial; Further Status Conferenc...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-06-16T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Further Status Conference) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-05-17T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-12-09T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint (2nd)) Filed by CUIJUAN LIU (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-01-25T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed by DAVID HAIBO YANG, an individual (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-02T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed by CUIJUAN LIU (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-03-01T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed by DEAN TIANDA YANG, an individual (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-09-17T00:00:00Amended Complaint ((1st)) Filed by CUIJUAN LIU (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-10-19T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice Filed by Clerk
Date: 2023-02-08T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed by VIVIAN RAN ANN, an individual (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-02T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by DAVID HAIBO YANG, an individual (Defendant)
Date: 2020-10-05T00:00:00Status Conference Statement Filed by CUIJUAN LIU (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-05-16T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed by CUIJUAN LIU (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-09-27T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name) Filed by CUIJUAN LIU (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-05-17T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Further Status Conference) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-04-13T00:00:00Amended Complaint ((2nd)) Filed by CUIJUAN LIU (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-11-04T00:00:00Complaint
Date: October 17, 2019Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: October 22, 2019Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: October 17, 2019Proof of Personal Service
Date: December 02, 2019Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: December 02, 2019Declaration - DECLARATION FOR AUTOMATIC EXTENSION OF TIME IN WHICH TO RESPOND
Date: December 10, 2019Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)
Date: January 17, 2020Motion re: - MOTION RE: TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT
Date: January 17, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: February 19, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: February 03, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: March 13, 2020Amended Complaint
Date: March 13, 2020Notice - NOTICE OF UNTIMELY FILING OF FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: March 16, 2020Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 03/18/2020
Date: March 18, 2020Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: March 18, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: March 18, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: April 29, 2020Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 04/29/2020
Date: April 29, 2020Substitution of Attorney
Date: August 31, 2020Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: December 01, 2020Answer
Date: December 01, 2020Proof of Service by Mail
Date: December 01, 2020Proof of Service by Mail
Date: April 28, 2021Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil
Date: May 21, 2021Status Conference Statement
Date: May 16, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: May 17, 2022Case Management Statement (Amended) Filed by CUIJUAN LIU (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-10-19T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed by CUIJUAN LIU (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-06-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-07-15T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment Filed by CUIJUAN LIU (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Sanctions Against Defense Counsel for...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-05-05T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by CUIJUAN LIU (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-09-26T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2019-10-17T00:00:00Notice (Of Untimely Filing of First Amended Complaint)
Date: 2020-03-16T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2019-10-17T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)
Date: 2020-01-17T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2022-03-01T00:00:00Case Management Statement (Amended)
Date: 2020-10-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Further Status Conference))
Date: 2022-04-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion...))
Date: 2020-09-17T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2020-12-02T00:00:00Opposition (DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF CUIJUAN LIU'S MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL)
Date: 2021-05-06T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2020-08-31T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2019-10-22T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of )
Date: 2020-03-18T00:00:00Motion re: (To Strike Portions of Plaintiff's Complaint)
Date: 2020-01-17T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2019-12-02T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2019-12-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2020-02-19T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2019-10-17T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2021-04-28T00:00:00Amended Complaint ( (2nd))
Date: 2020-10-19T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2020-08-31T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-10-05T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2019-10-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Further Status Conference))
Date: 2022-05-17T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2020-09-16T00:00:00Amended Complaint (1st)
Date: 2020-03-13T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2020-08-31T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel))
Date: 2021-05-21T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2020-12-01T00:00:00Status Conference Statement
Date: 2022-05-16T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2020-12-02T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2020-12-02T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2021-06-01T00:00:00Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil
Date: 2021-05-21T00:00:00Declaration (For Automatic Extension of Time in Which to Respond)
Date: 2019-12-10T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Further Status Conference) of )
Date: 2022-04-13T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment
Date: 2020-12-09T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-02-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-04-29T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil
Date: 2021-04-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Sanctions Against Defense Counsel for...))
Date: 2022-05-05T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2020-12-01T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-12-01T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-03-13T00:00:00Motion to Continue (the trial)
Date: 2022-05-17T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of )
Date: 2020-04-29T00:00:00Declaration (Responsive Declaration of Frank S. Hwu, Esq. for OSC re: Sanctions)
Date: 2022-05-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2021-01-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-03-18T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2020-03-18T00:00:00Opposition (PLAINTIFF?S OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; PROPOSED ORDER)
Date: 2020-09-03T00:00:00Order (re Demurrer to Complaint)
Date: 2020-09-17T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Further Status Conference) of )
Date: 2022-05-17T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2021-04-27T00:00:00Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel
Date: 2021-04-27T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 04/29/2020)
Date: 2020-04-29T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2019-10-17T00:00:00Order (re Demurrer to Complaint)
Date: 2020-09-17T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-10-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-04-29T00:00:00Motion re: (To Strike Portions of Plaintiff's Complaint)
Date: 2020-01-17T00:00:00Opposition (PLAINTIFF?S OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; PROPOSED ORDER)
Date: 2020-09-03T00:00:00Case Management Statement (Amended)
Date: 2020-10-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-03-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2021-01-07T00:00:00Amended Complaint (1st)
Date: 2020-03-13T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)
Date: 2020-01-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2020-02-19T00:00:00Notice (Of Untimely Filing of First Amended Complaint)
Date: 2020-03-16T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 03/18/2020)
Date: 2020-03-18T00:00:00Amended Complaint ( (2nd))
Date: 2020-10-19T00:00:00Declaration (For Automatic Extension of Time in Which to Respond)
Date: 2019-12-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion...))
Date: 2020-09-17T00:00:00Opposition (DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF CUIJUAN LIU'S MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL)
Date: 2021-05-06T00:00:00Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 21, 2023 | Hearing |
Department 57 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012 Case Management Conference |
|
November 21, 2023 | Hearing |
Department 57 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012 Hearing on Motion for Order Plaintiff CUIJUAN LIU?S noticed of motion to strike defendants "unverified" answer to plaintiffs "verified" complaint and for order entering default |
|
November 21, 2023 | Hearing |
Department 57 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012 Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service |
|
November 21, 2023 | Hearing |
Department 57 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012 Hearing on Motion - Other Entering Default as to Certain Defendants or in the alternative to compel Deputy Clerk E. Brown, Erika Brown or David W. Slayton to enter default on the referenced defendants |
|
November 21, 2023 | Hearing |
Department 57 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012 Order to Show Cause Re: Entry of Default as to Defendants that Have Been Served but Have Not Answered |
|
October 02, 2023 | Hearing | Order to Show Cause Re: Entry of Default as to Defendants that Have Been Served but Have Not Answered scheduled for in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 57 | |
October 02, 2023 | Hearing | On the Court's own motion, Case Management Conference scheduled for in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 57 Held - Continued was rescheduled to 08:30 AM | |
October 02, 2023 | Hearing | On the Court's own motion, Order to Show Cause Re: Entry of Default as to Defendants that Have Been Served but Have Not Answered scheduled for in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 57 Held - Continued was rescheduled to 08:30 AM | |
October 02, 2023 | Hearing | Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service as to Vivian Ran Ann [EFX Holdings Inc.]; Forex Group, Inc; and INTL FCStone Inc. scheduled for in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 57 | |
October 02, 2023 | Hearing | On the Court's own motion, Hearing on Motion - Other Entering Default as to Certain Defendants or in the alternative to compel Deputy Clerk E. Brown, Erika Brown or David W. Slayton to enter default on the referenced defendants scheduled for in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 57 Held - Continued was rescheduled to 08:30 AM |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.