Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Zarate De Isusquiza Elizabeth, filed a(n) Wrongful Termination - Labor and Employment case represented by Younessi Ramin R., against Express Employment Professionals An Unknown Business Entity, Express Services Inc. A Colorado Corporation, Virun Inc. A Delaware Corporation, represented by Elliott Roberta Burnette, Smith Melissa Marie, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with David Sotelo presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDavid Sotelo Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management149 days |
Filing DateOctober 16, 2019 |
CategoryWrongful Termination (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeWrongful Termination |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Complaint
Date: October 16, 2019Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-10-16T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-11-05T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: March 09, 2020Case Management Statement; Filed by: VIRUN, INC., a Delaware Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2020-02-28T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: ELIZABETH ZARATE DE ISUSQUIZA (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-02-27T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-11-05T00:00:00Complaint
Date: October 16, 2019Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: October 16, 2019Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: October 16, 2019Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: October 16, 2019Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service
Date: November 05, 2019Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: November 05, 2019Proof of Personal Service
Date: November 07, 2019Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: November 07, 2019Answer
Date: December 10, 2019Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: February 27, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: February 27, 2020Proof of Service by Mail
Date: February 27, 2020Answer
Date: February 28, 2020Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION AND ORDER
Date: March 03, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: March 09, 2020Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 03/09/2020
Date: March 09, 2020Request for Dismissal
Date: November 19, 2020Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2019-10-16T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 03/09/2020)
Date: 2020-03-09T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2019-10-16T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2019-12-10T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service
Date: 2019-11-05T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-02-27T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2019-10-16T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2019-11-07T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-02-27T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2020-02-27T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-02-28T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2019-11-05T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-02-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-03-09T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2019-11-07T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (Stipulation and Order)
Date: 2020-03-03T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-02-28T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.