Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Morales Jim, filed a(n) Wrongful Termination - Labor and Employment case represented by Rothman Jay S., against Henley Pacific La Llc, Valvoline Instant Oil Change, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Michael P. Linfield presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMichael P. Linfield Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 17, 2019 |
CategoryWrongful Termination (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedSeptember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeWrongful Termination |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: October 17, 2019Complaint
Date: October 17, 2019Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: October 17, 2019Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: October 17, 2019Proof of Personal Service
Date: November 05, 2019Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: November 06, 2019Proof of Service by Mail
Date: November 22, 2019Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: November 27, 2019Request for Dismissal
Date: December 02, 2019Clerk of Court Notice of Clerical Error and Correction
Date: December 30, 2019Notice of Settlement
Date: September 25, 2020Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)
Date: September 28, 2020Declaration - DECLARATION OF SERVICE
Date: September 29, 2020Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement); Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-09-28T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by: Jim Morales (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-11-27T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service; Filed by: Jim Morales (Plaintiff); Service Cost Waived: No
Date: 2019-11-05T00:00:00Clerk of Court Notice of Clerical Error and Correction; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-12-30T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-11-06T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by Jim Morales (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-10-17T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-10-17T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by Jim Morales (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-12-02T00:00:00Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-09-28T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-10-17T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by Jim Morales (Plaintiff)
Date: November 05, 2020Notice of Settlement Filed by Jim Morales (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-25T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Jim Morales (Plaintiff) PROCEEDINGS HELD
Date: 2019-10-17T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Jim Morales (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-11-27T00:00:00Declaration (of Service) Filed by Jim Morales (Plaintiff)
Date: September 29, 2020Clerk of Court Notice of Clerical Error and Correction Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-12-30T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-11-06T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by Jim Morales (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-10-17T00:00:00Declaration of Service; Filed by: Jim Morales (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-29T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Filed by Jim Morales (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-11-05T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2019-10-17T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2019-12-02T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2019-10-17T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2019-10-17T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2019-11-05T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2019-10-17T00:00:00Order (Proposed Order on Joint Stipulation to Submit Matter to Binding Arbitration and Stay the Action)
Date: 2019-12-03T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2019-11-06T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2019-11-22T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (Joint Stipulation to Submit Matter to Binding Arbitration and Stay the Action)
Date: 2019-12-03T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2019-11-27T00:00:00Clerk of Court Notice of Clerical Error and Correction
Date: 2019-12-30T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.