Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Pastrana Jesus, Pastrana Jose, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Velasco Cynthia, against Pastrana Jesus, represented by Ofarrill Anthony J., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Richard J. Burdge Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRichard J. Burdge Jr. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management264 days |
Filing DateOctober 18, 2019 |
CategoryOther Real Property (Not Eminent Domain, Landlord/Tenant, Foreclosure) (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Answer; Filed by: Jesus Pastrana (Defendant); As to: Jose Pastrana (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-11-21T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-10-18T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Jose Pastrana (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-04-15T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for [Minute Order (Court Order)]; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-04-21T00:00:00Cross-Complaint; Filed by: Jesus Pastrana (Defendant); As to: Jose Pastrana (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-11-21T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Jose Pastrana (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-03-23T00:00:00Complaint; Filed by: Jose Pastrana (Plaintiff); As to: Jesus Pastrana (Defendant)
Date: 2019-10-18T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-10-31T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Jesus Pastrana (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2020-04-14T00:00:00Case Management Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-07-08T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Jose Pastrana (Plaintiff); As to: Jesus Pastrana (Defendant)
Date: 2019-10-18T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-10-02T00:00:00Notice of Lis Pendens; Filed by: Jose Pastrana (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-11-04T00:00:00Summons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Jose Pastrana (Plaintiff); As to: Jesus Pastrana (Defendant)
Date: 2019-10-18T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-10-31T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail; Filed by: Jose Pastrana (Plaintiff); As to: Jesus Pastrana (Defendant)
Date: 2019-11-01T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail Filed by Jose Pastrana (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-11-01T00:00:00Notice (of Case Management Conference) Filed by Jose Pastrana (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-03-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-07-08T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by Jesus Pastrana (Cross-Complainant); Jose Pastrana (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-03-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-04-20T00:00:00Summons (Cross-Complaint) Filed by Jesus Pastrana (Defendant)
Date: 2019-11-21T00:00:00Answer (to Cross Complainants' Verified Cross-Complaint) Filed by Jose Pastrana (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2019-12-04T00:00:00Answer Filed by Jesus Pastrana (Defendant)
Date: 2019-11-21T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-10-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Further Status Conference Re: status of settlement and discovery)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-11-02T00:00:00Cross-Complaint Filed by Jesus Pastrana (Defendant)
Date: 2019-11-21T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Jose Pastrana (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-04-15T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([Minute Order (Court Order)]) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-04-21T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by Jose Pastrana (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-10-18T00:00:00Notice of Lis Pendens Filed by Jose Pastrana (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-11-04T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by Jose Pastrana (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-10-18T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by Jose Pastrana (Plaintiff); Jesus Pastrana (Defendant)
Date: 2021-03-09T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-10-18T00:00:00Case Management Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-07-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-10-02T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Jesus Pastrana (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2020-04-14T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Jose Pastrana (Plaintiff) PROCEEDINGS HELD
Date: 2019-10-18T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-10-31T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-04-15T00:00:00Notice (of Case Management Conference)
Date: 2020-03-23T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2019-10-18T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2019-11-01T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([Minute Order (Court Order)])
Date: 2020-04-21T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2019-10-18T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2019-10-18T00:00:00Answer (CROSS-DEFENDANT'S VERIFIED ANSWER TO CROSS COMPLAINANT)S VERIFIED CROSS-COMPLAINT)
Date: 2019-12-04T00:00:00Case Management Order
Date: 2020-07-08T00:00:00Cross-Complaint
Date: 2019-11-21T00:00:00Notice of Lis Pendens
Date: 2019-11-04T00:00:00Summons (Cross-Complaint)
Date: 2019-11-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-04-20T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service
Date: 2019-10-31T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-10-02T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2019-10-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2020-07-08T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-04-14T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2019-11-21T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2019-10-31T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 10/02/2020)
Date: 2020-10-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Further Status Conference Re: status of settlement and discovery))
Date: 2020-11-02T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.