Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Green April, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case represented by Sirmabekian Sarkis, against Spahn Andrew, Woolbright Management Strategies Llc A Delaware Limited Liability Company, represented by Belilove Steve Ross, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Rafael A. Ongkeko presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRafael A. Ongkeko Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management122 days |
Filing DateOctober 15, 2019 |
CategoryOther Employment Complaint Case (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Complaint
Date: October 15, 2019Complaint
Date: October 15, 2019Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: October 15, 2019Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by April Green (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-10-15T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by April Green (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-10-15T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-03-26T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: April Green (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-02-13T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-10-18T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-10-15T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: April Green (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-01-30T00:00:00Case Management Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-02-14T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-10-18T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by April Green (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-01-30T00:00:00Complaint Filed by April Green (Plaintiff) PROCEEDINGS HELD
Date: 2019-10-15T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-10-15T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-03-26T00:00:00Case Management Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-02-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Joint Stipulation and [Proposed] Order to Co...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-12-16T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by April Green (Plaintiff)
Date: May 03, 2021Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-02-14T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees Filed by April Green (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-02-13T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by April Green (Plaintiff)
Date: June 14, 2021Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2019-10-15T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-01-30T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2020-02-13T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2019-10-15T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-01-30T00:00:00Case Management Order
Date: 2020-02-14T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2020-01-30T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2019-10-15T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2019-10-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2020-02-14T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.