Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Arevalo Felipe C., Arevalo Maria V., filed a(n) Contractual Fraud - Commercial case represented by Heerekar Hari, against Tesla Inc., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Michael P. Linfield presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMichael P. Linfield Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management133 days |
Filing DateOctober 17, 2019 |
CategoryContractual Fraud (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions315 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeContractual Fraud |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Case Cycle Time315 days |
Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: October 17, 2019Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: October 17, 2019Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: October 17, 2019Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Entry of Default and/or Case Manageme...))
Date: August 27, 2020Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2019-10-17T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2020-01-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2020-02-27T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2019-10-17T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2019-10-17T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2020-04-10T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2020-03-18T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2019-11-06T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2019-10-17T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.