Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Gomez Anthony, Gomez Jose Antonio, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Dolin Tionna Grace, Tai Daniel, against Nissan North America Inc., represented by Sweeney Michael P., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Robert S. Draper presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRobert S. Draper Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management121 days |
Filing DateOctober 15, 2019 |
CategoryBreach Of Rental/Lease Contract (Not Unlawful Detainer Or Wrongful Eviction) (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-10-23T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order re Peremptory Challenge) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-10-23T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-10-24T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-10-15T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-10-18T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-10-18T00:00:00Case Management Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-02-13T00:00:00Notice of Case REassignment; Filed by: ANTHONY GOMEZ (Plaintiff); JOSE ANTONIO GOMEZ (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-10-31T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: ANTHONY GOMEZ (Plaintiff); JOSE ANTONIO GOMEZ (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-01-29T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: NISSAN NORTH AMERICA, INC (Defendant)
Date: 2020-01-24T00:00:00Statement of the Case Joint; Filed by: Anthony Gomez (Plaintiff); Jose Antonio Gomez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-08-04T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: ANTHONY GOMEZ (Plaintiff); JOSE ANTONIO GOMEZ (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-01-29T00:00:00Exhibit List Joint; Filed by: Anthony Gomez (Plaintiff); Jose Antonio Gomez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-08-04T00:00:00Witness List Joint; Filed by: Anthony Gomez (Plaintiff); Jose Antonio Gomez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-08-04T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2019-10-15T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2019-10-15T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2019-10-15T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re Peremptory Challenge) of 10/23/2019)
Date: 2019-10-23T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2020-01-29T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2019-10-15T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2019-10-24T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings
Date: 2019-10-23T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)
Date: 2019-10-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2020-02-13T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2019-10-18T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service
Date: 2019-10-18T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-01-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re Peremptory Challenge))
Date: 2019-10-23T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2019-11-14T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2019-10-24T00:00:00Notice ( of Case REassignment)
Date: 2019-10-31T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference))
Date: 2020-08-17T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-01-24T00:00:00Notice (OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: 2019-12-30T00:00:00Case Management Order
Date: 2020-02-13T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.