Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Delgado Mario Maria, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Sweeney Michael P., Tai Daniel, against Nissan North America Inc., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Michael P. Linfield presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMichael P. Linfield Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management134 days |
Filing DateOctober 15, 2019 |
CategoryOther Breach Of Contract/Warranty (Not Fraud Or Negligence) (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: October 15, 2019Complaint
Date: October 15, 2019Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: October 15, 2019Answer; Filed by: Nissan North America, Inc. (Defendant); As to: Mario Maria Delgado (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-11-13T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Nissan North America, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-02-06T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-11-05T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Mario Maria Delgado (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-02-07T00:00:00Notice OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Filed by: Mario Maria Delgado (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-01-21T00:00:00Complaint; Filed by: Mario Maria Delgado (Plaintiff); As to: NISSAN NORTH AMERICA, INC. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-10-15T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-10-15T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Mario Maria Delgado (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-02-07T00:00:00Notice of Settlement Filed by Mario Maria Delgado (Plaintiff)
Date: August 05, 2021Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-03-05T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Nissan North America, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-02-06T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by Mario Maria Delgado (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-10-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-03-05T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by Mario Maria Delgado (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-10-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement))) Filed by Clerk
Date: August 06, 2021Notice (OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) Filed by Mario Maria Delgado (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-01-21T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Mario Maria Delgado (Plaintiff) PROCEEDINGS HELD
Date: 2019-10-15T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Filed by Mario Maria Delgado (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-10-21T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (Stipulation and Protective Order) Filed by Mario Maria Delgado (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-10-29T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Mario Maria Delgado (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-02-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-10-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-02-26T00:00:00Answer Filed by Nissan North America, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-11-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-03-10T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-10-15T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-11-05T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees Filed by Mario Maria Delgado (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-02-07T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-03-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-06-07T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (Stipulation and Protective Order)
Date: 2020-10-29T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 03/05/2021)
Date: 2021-03-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2021-03-05T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-02-06T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2019-10-15T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2020-02-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference))
Date: 2021-03-10T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2019-10-15T00:00:00Notice (OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: 2020-01-21T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-02-07T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2019-10-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference))
Date: 2021-06-07T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2019-10-15T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2019-11-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2020-02-26T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2019-10-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference))
Date: 2020-10-15T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2019-11-13T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.