Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Aghajanian Padla, Alaverdian Allen, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Mcgee William R, against Jaguar Land Rover North America Llc, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Holly J. Fujie presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHolly J. Fujie Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateOctober 11, 2019 |
CategoryOther Breach Of Contract/Warranty (Not Fraud Or Negligence) (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Case Cycle Time187 days |
Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-10-16T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Allen Alaverdian (Plaintiff); Padla Aghajanian (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-01-15T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Appearance Case Review) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-02-03T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-10-16T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: April 15, 2020Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-03-17T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-10-11T00:00:00Notice of Removal to Federal Court; Filed by: Jaguar Land Rover North America, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2019-12-23T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Allen Alaverdian (Plaintiff); Padla Aghajanian (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-01-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-04-15T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-10-11T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by Allen Alaverdian (Plaintiff); Padla Aghajanian (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-10-11T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Filed by Allen Alaverdian (Plaintiff); Padla Aghajanian (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-10-23T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Allen Alaverdian (Plaintiff); Padla Aghajanian (Plaintiff) PROCEEDINGS HELD
Date: 2019-10-11T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by Allen Alaverdian (Plaintiff); Padla Aghajanian (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-10-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-02-03T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-03-17T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-02-03T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by Allen Alaverdian (Plaintiff); Padla Aghajanian (Plaintiff)
Date: October 13, 2020Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-10-16T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-10-16T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-04-15T00:00:00Notice of Removal to Federal Court Filed by Jaguar Land Rover North America, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2019-12-23T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service
Date: 2019-10-16T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2019-10-11T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2020-03-17T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-01-15T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review) of 02/03/2020)
Date: 2020-02-03T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2019-10-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-04-15T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2019-10-16T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2019-10-11T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 04/15/2020)
Date: 2020-04-15T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2019-10-23T00:00:00Notice of Removal to Federal Court
Date: 2019-12-23T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2019-10-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review))
Date: 2020-02-03T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.