Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Hosain Morsheda An Individual, Lilia Garcia-Brower California State Labor Commissioner Division Of Labor Standards Enforcement Department Of Industrial Relations State Of California On Behalf Of The People Of The State Of California., filed a(n) Wrongful Termination - Labor and Employment case represented by Corres-Morales Adalberto, against 1-10 Does, Hosain Family Child Care Llc. A California Limited Liability Company;, Hosain Morsheda An Individual, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Steven J. Kleifield presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSteven J. Kleifield Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management121 days |
Filing DateOctober 15, 2019 |
CategoryWrongful Termination (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeWrongful Termination |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Complaint
Date: October 15, 2019Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: October 15, 2019Complaint
Date: October 15, 2019Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: October 15, 2019Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: October 16, 2019Proof of Personal Service
Date: November 21, 2019Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
Date: November 27, 2019Cross-Complaint
Date: November 27, 2019Summons - SUMMONS ON CROSS COMPLAINT
Date: November 27, 2019Answer
Date: November 27, 2019Proof of Service by Mail
Date: December 18, 2019Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: December 13, 2019Notice of Stay of Proceedings (Bankruptcy)
Date: January 24, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: January 28, 2020Request for Dismissal
Date: June 24, 2021Notice - NOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE RE BANKRUPTCY
Date: May 13, 2021Notice - NOTICE OF CHANGE OF HANDLING ATTORNEY WITHIN AGENCY
Date: March 16, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE: BANKRUPTCY)
Date: April 22, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE: BANKRUPTCY)
Date: June 25, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE: BANKRUPTCY)
Date: October 26, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE: BANKRUPTCY)
Date: July 22, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: February 13, 2020Summary of the Case
Date: January 31, 2022Unknown - DECLARATION RE: ADD-ON ON PETITION OF ADALBERTO CORRES ISO DEFAULT JUDGMENT
Date: January 31, 2022Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: January 31, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DEFAULT JUDGMENT)
Date: February 02, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT)
Date: March 07, 2022Judgment
Date: March 07, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)
Date: March 09, 2022Cross-Complaint
Date: 2019-11-27T00:00:00Notice (of Change of Handling Attorney Within Agency)
Date: 2020-03-16T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2019-10-16T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2019-12-18T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2019-11-21T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2019-10-15T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-01-28T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2019-11-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal of the Cross-Complaint Purs...))
Date: April 21, 2022Summons (on Cross Complaint)
Date: 2019-11-27T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2019-12-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference Re: Bankruptcy))
Date: 2021-10-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference Re: Bankruptcy))
Date: 2021-04-22T00:00:00Notice (of Status Conference re Bankruptcy)
Date: 2021-05-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2020-02-13T00:00:00Summary of the Case
Date: 2022-01-31T00:00:00Declaration Re: Add-On on Petition (of Adalberto Corres ISO Default Judgment)
Date: 2022-01-31T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re: Entry of Default Judgment) of )
Date: 2022-03-07T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review) of )
Date: March 09, 2022Minute Order ( (Status Conference Re: Bankruptcy))
Date: 2021-06-25T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2019-10-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference Re: Bankruptcy))
Date: 2020-07-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Entry of Default Judgment))
Date: 2022-03-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: default judgment))
Date: 2022-02-02T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2019-10-15T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2022-01-31T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
Date: 2019-11-27T00:00:00Notice of Stay of Proceedings (Bankruptcy)
Date: 2020-01-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review))
Date: March 09, 2022Request for Dismissal
Date: 2021-06-24T00:00:00Judgment
Date: 2022-03-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2020-02-13T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
Date: 2019-11-27T00:00:00Notice (of Change of Handling Attorney Within Agency)
Date: 2020-03-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference Re: Bankruptcy))
Date: 2020-07-22T00:00:00Summons (on Cross Complaint)
Date: 2019-11-27T00:00:00Notice of Stay of Proceedings (Bankruptcy)
Date: 2020-01-24T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2019-10-15T00:00:00Declaration Re: Add-On on Petition (of Adalberto Corres ISO Default Judgment)
Date: 2022-01-31T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference Re: Bankruptcy))
Date: 2021-10-26T00:00:00Notice (of Status Conference re Bankruptcy)
Date: 2021-05-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference Re: Bankruptcy))
Date: 2021-06-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference Re: Bankruptcy))
Date: 2021-04-22T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.