Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Magee Eric, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case represented by Felahy Allen, against City National Bank, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Stuart M. Rice presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeStuart M. Rice Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateOctober 15, 2019 |
CategoryOther Employment Complaint Case (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Case Cycle Time147 days |
Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: October 15, 2019Complaint
Date: October 15, 2019Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: October 15, 2019Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2019-10-15T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2019-10-15T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: October 23, 2019Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2019-10-17T00:00:00Notice (of Case Management Conference)
Date: 2019-10-23T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2019-10-15T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: March 10, 2020Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2019-10-15T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: January 30, 2020Stipulation and Order (TO SUBMIT TO BINDING ARBITRATION AND STAY ACTION)
Date: November 18, 2019For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.