Case Last Refreshed: 11 months ago
Reed Destiny, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case against Atwater Anthony Lamar, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Stuart M. Rice presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeStuart M. Rice Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management121 days |
Filing DateOctober 15, 2019 |
CategoryContract/Warranty Breach - Seller Plaintiff (No Fraud/Negligence) (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedMay 26, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions266 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Case Cycle Time266 days |
Summons - Summons on Complaint
Date: October 15, 2019Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: October 15, 2019Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
Date: October 15, 2019Complaint
Date: October 15, 2019Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: October 15, 2019Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: October 17, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: February 13, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: April 15, 2020Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 04/15/2020
Date: April 15, 2020Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-04-15T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2019-10-15T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2019-10-15T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2019-10-15T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
Date: 2019-10-15T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Case Management Conference) of 02/13/2020)
Date: 2020-02-13T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2019-10-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2020-02-13T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2019-10-15T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 04/15/2020)
Date: 2020-04-15T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.