Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Penman Elsa, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case represented by Scherwin Jeremy, against Cemex Construction Materials Pacific Llc, Cemex Inc, Nunez Robert, represented by Osowski Amanda M., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Robert S. Draper presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRobert S. Draper Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management121 days |
Filing DateOctober 15, 2019 |
CategoryOther Employment Complaint Case (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: October 15, 2019Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: October 15, 2019Complaint
Date: October 15, 2019Complaint; Filed by: Elsa Penman (Plaintiff); As to: Robert Nunez (Defendant); Cemex, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-10-15T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-10-15T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: Cemex, Inc. (Defendant); As to: Elsa Penman (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-11-14T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Elsa Penman (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-02-07T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Cemex, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-01-28T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-11-01T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Robert Nunez (Defendant); Cemex, Inc (Defendant)
Date: 2021-04-01T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Cemex, Inc (Defendant)
Date: 2020-03-10T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Elsa Penman (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-07-27T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-03-18T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Cemex, Inc (Defendant)
Date: 2020-07-22T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-04-22T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-08-21T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: CEMEX CONSTRUCTION MATERIALS PACIFIC, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2020-10-29T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Cemex, Inc (Defendant)
Date: 2020-09-11T00:00:00Notice of Settlement; Filed by: Elsa Penman (Plaintiff); Vacate Future Dates: No
Date: 2021-04-05T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: Robert Nunez (Defendant)
Date: 2020-11-06T00:00:00Informal Discovery Conference Filed by Cemex, Inc (Defendant)
Date: 2020-11-09T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Cemex, Inc (Defendant)
Date: 2020-01-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-09-29T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Elsa Penman (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-07-27T00:00:00Informal Discovery Conference Filed by Elsa Penman (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-10-13T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order (- CMC) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-03-18T00:00:00Answer Filed by Robert Nunez (Defendant)
Date: 2020-11-06T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Elsa Penman (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-02-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC))) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-12-08T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name) Filed by Elsa Penman (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-10-27T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Filed by Elsa Penman (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-03-05T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-10-15T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-08-21T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-04-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Informal Discovery Conference (IDC))) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-11-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-08-06T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-11-01T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Elsa Penman (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-10-15T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by Elsa Penman (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-10-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-04-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-02-13T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Cemex, Inc (Defendant)
Date: 2020-07-22T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Cemex, Inc (Defendant)
Date: 2020-09-11T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Robert Nunez (Defendant); Cemex, Inc (Defendant)
Date: 2021-04-01T00:00:00Answer Filed by Cemex, Inc (Defendant)
Date: 2019-11-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Informal Discovery Conference (IDC))) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-01-13T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Cemex, Inc (Defendant)
Date: 2020-03-10T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by Elsa Penman (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-10-15T00:00:00Notice of Settlement Filed by Elsa Penman (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-04-05T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by Elsa Penman (Plaintiff)
Date: June 03, 2021Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-10-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re Stipulation and Protective Order-Confidential ...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-10-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-04-26T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by CEMEX CONSTRUCTION MATERIALS PACIFIC, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2020-10-29T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2019-10-15T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2019-10-15T00:00:00Notice of Settlement
Date: 2021-04-05T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-07-27T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2021-03-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re Stipulation and Protective Order-Confidential ...))
Date: 2020-10-06T00:00:00Informal Discovery Conference
Date: 2020-10-13T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2019-11-01T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order (- CMC)
Date: 2020-03-18T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2019-10-15T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-02-07T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2019-11-14T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2019-10-15T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (Stipuation and Protective Order ? Confidential Designation Only)
Date: 2020-10-06T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2020-08-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC)))
Date: 2020-12-08T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: 2020-10-27T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-03-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2020-09-29T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-04-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2020-08-06T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-07-22T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-01-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2020-10-07T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-09-11T00:00:00Informal Discovery Conference
Date: 2020-11-09T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 04/22/2020)
Date: 2020-04-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Informal Discovery Conference (IDC)))
Date: 2021-01-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-04-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Informal Discovery Conference (IDC)))
Date: 2020-11-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2020-02-13T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-11-06T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-10-29T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.