Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Cr¿Me De La Cr¿Me Inc. A California Corporation, Mesha Llc Dba Aqualilies A California Limited Liability Company, Greenberg An Individual Igor, Greenberg An Individual Marina, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Bederman David Samuel, Treyzon Boris, against Access Companies Llc A Delaware Limited Liability Company, Access Destination Services Llc A Delaware Limited Liability Company, Cr¿Me De La Cr¿Me Inc. A California Corporation, Mesha Llc Dba Aqualilies A California Limited Liability Company, Qshark Moving Company Inc. A California Corporation, (total of 6) See All represented by Boggs Josiah C., Canada Richard Brent, Case Anthony Thomas, Gharzeddine Amanda A., Lowary Mark Eric, (total of 9) See All in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Stephanie M. Bowick presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeStephanie M. Bowick Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management299 days |
Filing DateOctober 10, 2019 |
CategoryOther Real Property (Not Eminent Domain, Landlord/Tenant, Foreclosure) (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions299 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Complaint
Date: October 10, 2019Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: October 10, 2019Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: October 10, 2019Proof of Personal Service Filed by Igor Greenberg, an individual (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-10-28T00:00:00Answer Filed by THE LOCATION CONNECTION, INC., a California corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2020-02-13T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by THE LOCATION CONNECTION, INC., a California corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2020-03-03T00:00:00Answer Filed by QSHARK MOVING COMPANY, INC., a California corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2020-02-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Hearing on Motion to Dismiss)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-08-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-08-24T00:00:00Answer Filed by MESHA LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2019-12-09T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-04-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-04-15T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Filed by Igor Greenberg, an individual (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-10-30T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees Filed by MESHA LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2019-12-09T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by THE LOCATION CONNECTION, INC., a California corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2020-07-16T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by MESHA LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2020-02-07T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by MESHA LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2020-07-16T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Filed by Igor Greenberg, an individual (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-11-07T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-10-16T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-10-10T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service Filed by Igor Greenberg, an individual (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-10-31T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-02-05T00:00:00Answer Filed by CR¿ME DE LA CR¿ME, INC., a California corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2019-11-21T00:00:00Cross-Complaint Filed by CR¿ME DE LA CR¿ME, INC., a California corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2019-11-25T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial Filed by CR¿ME DE LA CR¿ME, INC., a California corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2019-11-21T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by QSHARK MOVING COMPANY, INC., a California corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2020-02-18T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by CR¿ME DE LA CR¿ME, INC., a California corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2020-01-29T00:00:00Cross-Complaint Filed by MESHA LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2019-12-09T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial Filed by MESHA LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2019-12-09T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees Filed by CR¿ME DE LA CR¿ME, INC., a California corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2019-11-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-03-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-02-05T00:00:00Summons (Cross-Complaint) Filed by CR¿ME DE LA CR¿ME, INC., a California corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2019-11-25T00:00:00Amendment to Cross-Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name) Filed by MESHA LLC (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2020-05-11T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by QSHARK MOVING COMPANY, INC., a California corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2020-03-05T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by CR¿ME DE LA CR¿ME, INC., a California corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2020-07-10T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by CR¿ME DE LA CR¿ME, INC., a California corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2020-03-05T00:00:00Association of Attorney Filed by THE LOCATION CONNECTION, INC., a California corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2020-04-06T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-03-16T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by CR¿ME DE LA CR¿ME, INC., a California corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2021-02-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference Re: Resolution of Entire Action)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-02-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Arbitration)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-02-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Arbitration)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-02-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference Re: Resolution of Entire Action)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-03-21T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Igor Greenberg, an individual (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-27T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re: Joint Stipulation) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-02-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Application for Determination ...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-06-11T00:00:00Notice of Settlement Filed by MESHA LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2021-09-03T00:00:00Motion to Compel Arbitration Filed by Igor Greenberg, an individual (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Issuance of Ruling on Applicat...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-11-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Application for Determination ...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-06-04T00:00:00Application for Determination of Good Faith Settlement Filed by MESHA LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2021-09-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-11-05T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-08-24T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information Filed by Sadaf Anahita Nejat (Attorney)
Date: 2021-05-06T00:00:00Order - Dismissal Filed by Court
Date: 2022-05-24T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by MESHA LLC (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2022-01-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Defendant Qshark Moving Company, Inc.?s and D...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-08-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Joint Stipulation)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-02-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference Re: Arbitration; Status Conference Re: Defe...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-12-06T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-11-05T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration ISO GFS) Filed by MESHA LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2021-10-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Application for Determination ...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-07-21T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information Filed by Josiah C. Boggs (Attorney)
Date: 2021-01-08T00:00:00Notice of Settlement Filed by QSHARK MOVING COMPANY, INC., a California corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2021-03-24T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2020-08-12T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-01-27T00:00:00Declaration (of Jennifer Wilson in Support of Opposition to Compel Arbitration)
Date: 2021-02-16T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-01-29T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-02-26T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-02-13T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2019-10-30T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2019-10-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-08-24T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of )
Date: 2020-03-16T00:00:00Declaration (OF SADAF A. NEJAT IN SUPPORT)
Date: 2019-12-23T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-03-05T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of )
Date: 2020-02-05T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2020-03-05T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2019-11-21T00:00:00Summons (Cross-Complaint)
Date: 2019-11-25T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-03-10T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2019-10-31T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-07-10T00:00:00Opposition (to Defendants Access Companies, LLC And Access Destination Services, LLCs Motion to Dismiss)
Date: 2020-03-12T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2020-02-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-04-15T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-07-20T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-02-18T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2019-11-21T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-02-18T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2019-12-09T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2020-01-22T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2019-11-07T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2019-10-10T00:00:00Amendment to Cross-Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: 2020-05-11T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-03-03T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-07-16T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2021-02-03T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-07-16T00:00:00Motion to Dismiss
Date: 2019-12-23T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial
Date: 2019-12-09T00:00:00Association of Attorney
Date: 2020-04-06T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2020-03-12T00:00:00Motion to Compel Arbitration
Date: 2020-09-25T00:00:00Cross-Complaint
Date: 2019-11-25T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2020-03-10T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2019-10-10T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2019-10-28T00:00:00Cross-Complaint
Date: 2019-12-09T00:00:00Notice (of Continued Case Management Conference)
Date: 2020-02-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-02-05T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-02-04T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-03-05T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2019-12-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Arbitration))
Date: 2021-02-23T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2019-10-10T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial
Date: 2019-11-21T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-02-07T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2021-02-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-03-16T00:00:00Order (GRANTING ACCESS COMPANIES, LLC AND ACCESS DESTINATION SERVICES, LLC'S MOTION TO DISMISS)
Date: 2020-08-04T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2019-10-16T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2019-12-23T00:00:00Opposition (Opposition to Motion to Compel Arbitration)
Date: 2021-01-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Hearing on Motion to Dismiss))
Date: 2020-08-04T00:00:00Notice of Settlement
Date: 2021-03-24T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of )
Date: 2020-04-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Arbitration))
Date: 2021-02-03T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2020-08-04T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2021-01-08T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of )
Date: 2020-08-24T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Remote Appearance)
Date: 2022-05-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Application for Determination ...))
Date: 2021-06-04T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration ISO GFS)
Date: 2021-10-12T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re: Joint Stipulation) of )
Date: 2022-02-01T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-03-26T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of )
Date: 2021-11-05T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re: Defendant Qshark Moving Company, Inc.?s and D...) of )
Date: 2021-08-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Application for Determination ...))
Date: 2021-07-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Application for Determination ...))
Date: 2021-06-11T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2021-05-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Joint Stipulation))
Date: 2022-02-01T00:00:00Application for Determination of Good Faith Settlement
Date: 2021-09-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2021-11-05T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2022-01-24T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2021-05-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Issuance of Ruling on Applicat...))
Date: 2021-11-03T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2022-01-21T00:00:00Notice of Settlement
Date: 2021-09-03T00:00:00Application for Determination of Good Faith Settlement
Date: 2021-03-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference Re: Resolution of Entire Action))
Date: 2022-05-24T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2022-01-14T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2022-03-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference Re: Resolution of Entire Action))
Date: 2022-03-21T00:00:00Order - Dismissal
Date: 2022-05-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference Re: Arbitration; Status Conference Re: Defe...))
Date: 2021-12-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference Re: Resolution of Entire Action))
Date: 2022-02-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Defendant Qshark Moving Company, Inc.?s and D...))
Date: 2021-08-23T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2019-10-10T00:00:00Summons (Cross-Complaint)
Date: 2019-11-25T00:00:00Declaration (OF SADAF A. NEJAT IN SUPPORT)
Date: 2019-12-23T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 02/05/2020)
Date: 2020-02-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-02-05T00:00:00Notice (of Continued Case Management Conference)
Date: 2020-02-18T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 03/16/2020)
Date: 2020-03-16T00:00:00Opposition (to Defendants Access Companies, LLC And Access Destination Services, LLCs Motion to Dismiss)
Date: 2020-03-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-03-16T00:00:00Amendment to Cross-Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: 2020-05-11T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 04/15/2020)
Date: 2020-04-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-04-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Hearing on Motion to Dismiss))
Date: 2020-08-04T00:00:00Order (GRANTING ACCESS COMPANIES, LLC AND ACCESS DESTINATION SERVICES, LLC'S MOTION TO DISMISS)
Date: 2020-08-04T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 08/24/2020)
Date: 2020-08-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-08-24T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-01-27T00:00:00Opposition (Opposition to Motion to Compel Arbitration)
Date: 2021-01-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Application for Determination ...))
Date: 2021-06-11T00:00:00Declaration (of Jennifer Wilson in Support of Opposition to Compel Arbitration)
Date: 2021-02-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Application for Determination ...))
Date: 2021-06-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Arbitration))
Date: 2021-02-03T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-03-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Application for Determination ...))
Date: 2021-07-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Defendant Qshark Moving Company, Inc.?s and D...))
Date: 2021-08-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Arbitration))
Date: 2021-02-23T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re: Joint Stipulation) of 02/01/2022)
Date: 2022-02-01T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 11/05/2021)
Date: 2021-11-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2021-11-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Joint Stipulation))
Date: 2022-02-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference Re: Resolution of Entire Action))
Date: 2022-02-01T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration ISO GFS)
Date: 2021-10-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference Re: Arbitration; Status Conference Re: Defe...))
Date: 2021-12-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Issuance of Ruling on Applicat...))
Date: 2021-11-03T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.