Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Juarez Samuel, Sanchez Gerardo, filed a(n) Wrongful Termination - Labor and Employment case represented by Younessi Ramin R., against Kcb Builders Incorporated A California Corporation, represented by Lozano David, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Elizabeth R. Feffer presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeElizabeth R. Feffer Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 10, 2019 |
CategoryWrongful Termination (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeWrongful Termination |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Summons (on Complaint) Filed by Samuel Juarez (Plaintiff); Gerardo Sanchez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-10-10T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by Samuel Juarez (Plaintiff); Gerardo Sanchez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-10-10T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-10-10T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-10-10T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Samuel Juarez (Plaintiff); Gerardo Sanchez (Plaintiff) PROCEEDINGS HELD
Date: 2019-10-10T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-10-29T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-10-29T00:00:00Answer Filed by KCB BUILDERS INCORPORATED, a California corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2019-12-13T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service Filed by Gerardo Sanchez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-11-01T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice Filed by Clerk
Date: August 25, 2020Notice of Settlement Filed by Samuel Juarez (Plaintiff); Gerardo Sanchez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-07-09T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-10-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Re Notice Of Settlement Of Entire ...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-07-13T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by Samuel Juarez (Plaintiff); Gerardo Sanchez (Plaintiff)
Date: September 10, 2020Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-10-29T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re Continuance Of Hearing Dates) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-04-28T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re Continuance Of Hearing Dates) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-04-28T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk
Date: August 25, 2020Minute Order ( (Court Order Re Continuance Of Hearing Dates)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-04-28T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service
Date: 2019-10-29T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2019-10-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Re Notice Of Settlement Of Entire ...))
Date: 2020-07-13T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2019-10-29T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2019-10-10T00:00:00Notice of Settlement
Date: 2020-07-09T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2019-10-10T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re Continuance Of Hearing Dates) of 04/28/2020)
Date: 2020-04-28T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2019-10-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re Continuance Of Hearing Dates))
Date: 2020-04-28T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2019-11-01T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2019-12-13T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: August 25, 2020For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.