Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Brower Lilia Garcia, Lilia Garcia Brower California State Labor Commissioner Division Of Labor Standards Enforcement Department Of Industrial Relations On Behalf Of The People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Bell David Lawrence, against 1-10 Does, Ronald Schilling M.D. A California Professional Corporation Dba Advance Care Specialist Medical Clinic, Schilling Ronald M.D., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Stuart M. Rice presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeStuart M. Rice Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management123 days |
Filing DateJanuary 02, 2019 |
CategoryContract/Warranty Breach - Seller Plaintiff (No Fraud/Negligence) (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-10-10T00:00:00Order RULING; Filed by: Clerk
Date: March 25, 2021Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-04-21T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-10-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal AND a Trial Setting Confere...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-11-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal AND a Trial Setting Confere...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-08-20T00:00:00Order (RULING) Filed by Clerk
Date: March 25, 2021Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Enforce Settlement; Order to Show Cause ...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-03-25T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Lilia Garcia Brower (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-02-06T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Lilia Garcia Brower (Plaintiff) PROCEEDINGS HELD
Date: 2019-10-10T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-10-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (per 664.6 CCP))) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-02-09T00:00:00Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-04-21T00:00:00Notice of Related Case Filed by Lilia Garcia Brower (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-02-06T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by Lilia Garcia Brower (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-10-10T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-10-17T00:00:00Notice (of Court Proceedings) Filed by Lilia Garcia Brower (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-18T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by Lilia Garcia Brower (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-10-10T00:00:00Motion to Enforce Settlement Filed by Lilia Garcia Brower (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-03-02T00:00:00Notice (of Court Proceedings) Filed by Lilia Garcia Brower (Plaintiff)
Date: April 20, 2021Judgment (Judgment) Filed by Lilia Garcia Brower (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-03-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-02-10T00:00:00Notice of Related Case
Date: 2020-02-06T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2019-10-10T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2019-10-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2020-02-10T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2019-10-10T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2019-10-10T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-02-06T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2019-10-10T00:00:00Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations
Date: 2020-04-21T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations])
Date: 2020-04-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal AND a Trial Setting Confere...))
Date: 2020-08-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (per 664.6 CCP)))
Date: 2021-02-09T00:00:00Motion to Enforce Settlement
Date: 2021-03-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal AND a Trial Setting Confere...))
Date: 2020-11-06T00:00:00Notice (of Court Proceedings)
Date: 2020-11-18T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Continuance of Hearing per Covid-19 State of Emergency Orders)
Date: 2020-05-04T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2019-10-10T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2019-10-10T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2019-10-10T00:00:00Notice of Related Case
Date: 2020-02-06T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-02-06T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Continuance of Hearing per Covid-19 State of Emergency Orders)
Date: 2020-05-04T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.