Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Gall Nicholas An Individual, filed a(n) Contractual Fraud - Commercial case represented by Babbitt Gregory T. Esq., against Bmw Of North America Llc A Limited Liability Company, Faa Beverly Hills Inc. A Corporation Dba Beverly Hills Bmw, represented by Chinery Jacqueline Bruce Esq., Robinett Timothy D., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Elizabeth R. Feffer presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeElizabeth R. Feffer Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management120 days |
Filing DateOctober 10, 2019 |
CategoryContractual Fraud (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeContractual Fraud |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-12-24T00:00:00Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement); Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-10-29T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-10-10T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-10-23T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-10-29T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-10-29T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: BMW of North America, LLC, a limited liability company (Defendant)
Date: 2020-01-23T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: FAA Beverly Hills, Inc., a corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2020-02-04T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Nicholas, Gall, an individual (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-01-24T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Nicholas, Gall, an individual (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-01-24T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-10-23T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: October 10, 2019Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: October 10, 2019Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: October 10, 2019Complaint
Date: October 10, 2019Affidavit - AFFIDAVIT AFFIDAVIT OF VENUE
Date: October 10, 2019Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings
Date: October 23, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: October 23, 2019Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: October 29, 2019Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service
Date: October 29, 2019Proof of Service by Mail - PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: November 04, 2019Proof of Service by Mail
Date: November 04, 2019Proof of Personal Service
Date: November 12, 2019Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)
Date: December 13, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE CASE REASSIGNMENT UPON CCP 170.6 CHALLENGE)
Date: December 20, 2019Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: December 24, 2019Notice - NOTICE OF HEARING
Date: January 07, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: January 23, 2020Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: January 23, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: January 24, 2020Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: January 24, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: February 04, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: February 07, 2020Answer
Date: August 07, 2020Statement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death)
Date: July 09, 2020Motion to Compel Arbitration
Date: August 21, 2020Request for Judicial Notice
Date: August 21, 2020Declaration - DECLARATION OF TYLER WEIGHT
Date: August 21, 2020Notice of Settlement - NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE;
Date: October 29, 2020Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)
Date: October 29, 2020Proof of Service by Mail
Date: November 03, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT))
Date: December 14, 2020Request for Dismissal
Date: December 14, 2020Answer
Date: November 21, 2019Answer
Date: December 10, 2019Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)
Date: 2019-12-13T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2019-11-04T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2019-10-10T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings
Date: 2019-10-23T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6) (RE Malcolm H. Mackey)
Date: 2019-10-21T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2019-10-10T00:00:00Affidavit (Affidavit of Venue)
Date: 2019-10-10T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail ( NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: 2019-11-04T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2019-10-10T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2019-11-21T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re Case Reassignment Upon CCP 170.6 Challenge) of 12/20/2019)
Date: 2019-12-20T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2019-12-10T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service
Date: 2019-10-29T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 10/23/2019)
Date: 2019-10-23T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2019-11-12T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2019-10-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2019-10-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re Case Reassignment Upon CCP 170.6 Challenge))
Date: 2019-12-20T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2019-10-29T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2020-01-23T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-02-04T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2020-08-21T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2019-12-24T00:00:00Notice of Settlement (of Entire Case;)
Date: 2020-10-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement)))
Date: 2020-12-14T00:00:00Declaration (of Tyler Weight)
Date: 2020-08-21T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-08-07T00:00:00Notice (of Hearing)
Date: 2020-01-07T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-01-23T00:00:00Motion to Compel Arbitration
Date: 2020-08-21T00:00:00Statement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death)
Date: 2020-07-09T00:00:00Amended Complaint ( (1st))
Date: 2020-07-09T00:00:00Notice (Of Significant New Authority Relevant To Defendant?s Pending Motion To Compel Arbitration)
Date: 2020-09-09T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2020-01-24T00:00:00Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)
Date: 2020-10-29T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2020-11-03T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-01-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2020-02-07T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.