Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Haghshenas Cameron Cina, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Ledbetter Thomas Kendall, against Italian Motorcoach Inc. A California Incorporation Dba Maserati Of Santa Monica, Maserati North America Inc. A Delaware Corporation, represented by Kizirian Eric Y, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Elizabeth R. Feffer presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeElizabeth R. Feffer Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 10, 2019 |
CategoryContract/Warranty Breach - Seller Plaintiff (No Fraud/Negligence) (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedSeptember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: October 10, 2019Complaint
Date: October 10, 2019Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: October 10, 2019Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: October 10, 2019Proof of Personal Service
Date: October 28, 2019Proof of Personal Service
Date: October 17, 2019Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: October 29, 2019Answer
Date: November 14, 2019Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: November 14, 2019Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: March 27, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE CONTINUANCE OF HEARING DATE)
Date: April 27, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: July 07, 2020Notice of Settlement
Date: July 15, 2020Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: August 25, 2020Notice - NOTICE PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT
Date: September 02, 2020Notice of Ruling
Date: September 30, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL AFTER SETTLEMENT)
Date: September 30, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL AFTER SETTLEMENT)
Date: November 19, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL AFTER SETTLEMENT)
Date: January 04, 2021Notice (Plaintiff's Notice of Case Reassignment)
Date: 2020-09-02T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2019-11-14T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re Continuance Of Hearing Date) of 04/27/2020)
Date: 2020-04-27T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2019-11-14T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2019-10-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re Continuance Of Hearing Date))
Date: 2020-04-27T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2020-03-27T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-07-07T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2020-08-25T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2019-10-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal After Settlement))
Date: September 30, 2020Complaint
Date: 2019-10-10T00:00:00Notice of Settlement
Date: 2020-07-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Re Notice Of Settlement Of Entire ...))
Date: 2020-07-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal After Settlement))
Date: November 19, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-07-07T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2019-10-28T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2019-10-17T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: September 30, 2020Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2019-10-29T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2019-10-10T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.