Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Martinez Jr. An Individual Abelardo, filed a(n) Intentional Torts - Torts case represented by Ferrell Scott J, against Belk Inc. A Delaware Corporation, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with David Sotelo presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDavid Sotelo Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateOctober 10, 2019 |
CategoryCivil Rights/Discrimination (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeIntentional Torts |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Case Cycle Time160 days |
Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2019-10-10T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2019-10-10T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: October 25, 2019Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2019-10-10T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2019-10-10T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: November 07, 2019Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service
Date: 2019-10-25T00:00:00Notice of Settlement
Date: February 14, 2020Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review re: Notice of Settlement;))
Date: March 05, 2020Request for Dismissal (With Prejudice, complaint, Entire Action)
Date: March 18, 2020For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.