Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Arrow Tools Fasteners & Saw Inc., filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Cantor Jon D., against Darmont Construction Corp., Gonzales Israel, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Robert S. Draper presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRobert S. Draper Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management127 days |
Filing DateOctober 07, 2019 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions329 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Case Cycle Time329 days |
Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-10-07T00:00:00Summary of the Case; Filed by: Arrow Tools, Fasteners & Saw, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-04-22T00:00:00Request for Dismissal; Filed by: Arrow Tools, Fasteners & Saw, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-04-22T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-04-28T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-03-23T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Order to Show Cause Re: Entry of Default Judgment) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-08-31T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-10-22T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2019-10-22T00:00:00Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)
Date: 2019-11-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2020-02-11T00:00:00Ruling Re: Request for Entry of Default Judgment
Date: 2020-08-31T00:00:00Declaration re: Due Diligence
Date: 2019-11-12T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-01-27T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2019-10-07T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2019-11-12T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2019-10-07T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2019-12-31T00:00:00Summary of the Case
Date: 2020-04-22T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2019-10-07T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2019-10-07T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2020-04-22T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2020-03-23T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 04/28/2020)
Date: 2020-04-28T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2020-04-22T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Order to Show Cause Re: Entry of Default Judgment) of 08/31/2020)
Date: 2020-08-31T00:00:00Notice (OF ERRATTA)
Date: 2020-08-21T00:00:00Default Judgment
Date: 2020-08-31T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-04-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Entry of Default Judgment))
Date: 2020-08-31T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.