Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Cabada Paula, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Gravich Robert, against Pelayo David, Pelayo Juana, represented by Kang Steve Andrew, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Georgina T. Rizk presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGeorgina T. Rizk Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 18, 2019 |
CategoryMotor Vehicle - Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedSeptember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: September 18, 2019Complaint
Date: September 18, 2019Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: September 18, 2019PI General Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-10-29T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-09-18T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by Paula Cabada (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-09-18T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by: Steve Andrew Kang (Attorney)
Date: 2020-03-27T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by Paula Cabada (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-09-18T00:00:00PI General Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-10-29T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by Paula Cabada (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-08T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial Filed by Juana Pelayo (Defendant); David Pelayo (Defendant)
Date: 2020-02-18T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Paula Cabada (Plaintiff) PROCEEDINGS HELD
Date: 2019-09-18T00:00:00Answer Filed by Juana Pelayo (Defendant); David Pelayo (Defendant)
Date: 2020-02-18T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial; Filed by: Juana Pelayo (Defendant); David Pelayo (Defendant)
Date: 2020-02-18T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: Juana Pelayo (Defendant); David Pelayo (Defendant); As to: Paula Cabada (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-02-18T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-09-18T00:00:00Complaint; Filed by: Paula Cabada (Plaintiff); As to: Juana Pelayo (Defendant); David Pelayo (Defendant)
Date: 2019-09-18T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2020-03-27T00:00:00PI General Order
Date: 2019-10-29T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-02-18T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2019-09-18T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial
Date: 2020-02-18T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2019-09-18T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates)
Date: 2019-10-29T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2019-09-18T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2019-09-18T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.