Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Campos Sandra, Cruz Saul, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Rios Ralph Martinez, against Gama David, Trucking Inc Gama, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Georgina T. Rizk presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGeorgina T. Rizk Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 13, 2019 |
CategoryPersonal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death - Uninsured Motorist (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Order - Dismissal; Filed by: Clerk
Date: March 12, 2021Request to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Sandra Campos (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-09-13T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: March 12, 2021Certificate of Mailing for (Final Status Conference) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-02-26T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Saul Cruz (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-09-13T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-09-13T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Sandra Campos (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-09-13T00:00:00Request to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Saul Cruz (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-09-13T00:00:00PI General Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-09-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference))
Date: 2021-02-26T00:00:00PI General Order
Date: 2019-09-19T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2019-09-13T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates)
Date: 2019-09-19T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2019-09-13T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2019-09-16T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Final Status Conference) of 02/26/2021)
Date: 2021-02-26T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2019-09-13T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
Date: 2019-09-13T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.