Case Last Refreshed: 1 day ago
Dolan Nancy, Eady-Marshall Virginia, Hanke Chelsea, Hutchins Amy, Johnson Dawn, (total of 11) See All filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case represented by Andrus Lori Erin, Goldstein Barry, Goldstein Byron R., Kan James, Lyons Elizabeth Lee, (total of 11) See All against American Broadcasting Companies Inc., Buena Vista Home Entertainment Inc., Disney Content Sales Llc, Hollywood Records Inc., The Walt Disney Company, (total of 10) See All represented by Besnoff Sarah, Camastra Emily Grace, Cedar Christine, Davis Felicia A., Farber Rebecca D., (total of 13) See All in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Superior with Daniel J. Buckley presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDaniel J. Buckley Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management287 days |
Filing DateApril 02, 2019 |
CategoryOther Employment Complaint Case (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedApril 18, 2024 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions253 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Joint Status Conference Statement; Filed by: The Walt Disney Company (Defendant)
Date: 2024-03-21T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by: Laronda Rasmussen (Plaintiff)
Date: 2024-03-06T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2024-01-30T00:00:00Stipulation and Order to use Certified Shorthand Reporter Ann Cavin, CSR # 13189; Filed by:
Date: 2024-01-29T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by: Laronda Rasmussen (Plaintiff)
Date: 2024-01-26T00:00:00Notice of Remote Appearance; Filed by: Laronda Rasmussen (Plaintiff)
Date: 2024-01-26T00:00:00Complaint; Filed by: Laronda Rasmussen (Plaintiff); As to: Walt Disney Company (Defendant)
Date: 2019-04-02T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Laronda Rasmussen (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-04-02T00:00:00Initial Status Conference Order; Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-04-18T00:00:00Summons on the First Amended Complaint; Filed by:
Date: 2019-07-09T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by:
Date: 2019-10-22T00:00:00Proof of Service; Filed by: The Walt Disney Company (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-23T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-02-11T00:00:00Notice of Lodging of Document Conditionally; Filed by: The Walt Disney Company (Defendant)
Date: 2021-02-09T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by: The Walt Disney Company (Defendant)
Date: 2021-02-09T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-03-30T00:00:00Stipulation and Order to use Certified Shorthand Reporter Sharon Cahn, CSR # 6210; Filed by:
Date: 2023-03-13T00:00:00Proof of Service; Filed by: Laronda Rasmussen (Plaintiff); As to: Laronda Rasmussen (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-10-19T00:00:00Opposition to plaintiffs' motion to strike; Filed by: The Walt Disney Company (Defendant)
Date: 2023-11-02T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-04-02T00:00:00Summons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-04-02T00:00:00Summons on Amended Complaint (2nd); Issued and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-09-18T00:00:00Proof of Service of Summons; Filed by: Laronda Rasmussen (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-10-15T00:00:00Order - Dismissal; Filed by: Court
Date: 2020-03-10T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-01-13T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-08-11T00:00:00Joint Status Conference Report Regarding Discovery Plan; Filed by: Laronda Rasmussen (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-01-07T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-04-21T00:00:00Notice of Remote Appearance; Filed by: Karen Moore (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-12-04T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-06-30T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: The Walt Disney Company (Defendant)
Date: 2020-03-23T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-08-24T00:00:00Proof of Service; Filed by: The Walt Disney Company (Defendant)
Date: 2020-08-14T00:00:00Message Board Posting Re: rescheduling hearing set for ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-02-17T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-09-08T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by: The Walt Disney Company (Defendant)
Date: 2020-11-05T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-08-31T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-10-21T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order re: Case Reassignment) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-06-20T00:00:00Notice of Lodging of Documents Marked as Confidential; Filed by: Laronda Rasmussen (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-02T00:00:00Proof of Service; Filed by: Laronda Rasmussen (Plaintiff); Service Cost Waived: No
Date: 2020-09-02T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-06-06T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: The Walt Disney Company (Defendant)
Date: 2019-12-20T00:00:00Proof of Service; Filed by: The Walt Disney Company (Defendant)
Date: 2020-09-11T00:00:00Notice of Continuance; Filed by: Laronda Rasmussen (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-17T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-09-23T00:00:00Proof of Service; Filed by: Laronda Rasmussen (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-10-26T00:00:00Message Board Posting Re: Continuance of hearing; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-09-30T00:00:00Notice of Lodging of Documents Marked as Confidential; Filed by: Laronda Rasmussen (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-10-26T00:00:00Message Board Posting Re: Continued Hearing set for ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-11-13T00:00:00Proof of Service; Filed by: Amy Hutchins (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-10-18T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Appearance Case Review) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-09-07T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-01-14T00:00:00Case Management Statement Joint; Filed by: The Walt Disney Company (Defendant)
Date: 2022-03-15T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re Initial Status Conference) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-06-21T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by: The Walt Disney Company (Defendant)
Date: 2023-12-01T00:00:00Declaration of Jaqueline Aranda Osorno; Filed by: Laronda Rasmussen (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-12-01T00:00:00Initial Status Conference Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-06-21T00:00:00Stipulation and Order to use Certified Shorthand Reporter; Filed by: The Walt Disney Company (Defendant)
Date: 2023-11-15T00:00:00Proof of Service; Filed by: Laronda Rasmussen (Plaintiff); As to: The Walt Disney Company (Defendant)
Date: 2023-11-21T00:00:00Plaintiffs' Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Laronda Rasmussen (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-11-21T00:00:00Notice of Remote Appearance; Filed by: Enny Joo (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-12-04T00:00:00Notice of Remote Appearance; Filed by: Nancy Dolan (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-12-04T00:00:00Notice of Remote Appearance; Filed by: Laronda Rasmussen (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-12-04T00:00:00Notice of Remote Appearance; Filed by: Dawn Johnson (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-12-04T00:00:00Notice of Remote Appearance; Filed by: Laronda Rasmussen (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-11-08T00:00:00Notice Of Remote Appearance; Filed by: Dawn Johnson (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-11-09T00:00:00Notice Of Remote Appearance; Filed by: Nancy Dolan (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-11-09T00:00:00Proof of Service; Filed by: Laronda Rasmussen (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-11-08T00:00:00Notice Of Remote Appearance; Filed by: Enny Joo (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-11-09T00:00:00Notice Of Remote Appearance; Filed by: Laronda Rasmussen (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-11-09T00:00:00Notice Of Remote Appearance; Filed by: Rebecca Train (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-11-09T00:00:00Notice Of Remote Appearance; Filed by: Karen Moore (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-11-09T00:00:00Message Board Posting Notice of Continued Hearing; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-03-20T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-02-22T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-09-13T00:00:00Joint Status Conference Statement; Filed by: The Walt Disney Company (Defendant)
Date: 2022-07-18T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Court Order re Newly Filed Class Action) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-04-18T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-10-17T00:00:00Status Conference Statement; Filed by: Laronda Rasmussen (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-05T00:00:00Joint Status Conference Statement; Filed by: The Walt Disney Company (Defendant)
Date: 2022-10-05T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-09-29T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-10-07T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-07-19T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-04-02T00:00:00Message Board Posting (Re: Continuance of hearing) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-09-30T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Laronda Rasmussen (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-02-24T00:00:00Proof of Service Filed by Laronda Rasmussen (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-02T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Laronda Rasmussen (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-11-21T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-04-02T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by Laronda Rasmussen (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-04-02T00:00:00Initial Status Conference Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-04-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re Rescheduling of Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-01-13T00:00:00Proof of Service Filed by The Walt Disney Company (Defendant)
Date: 2020-08-14T00:00:00Notice of Lodging (of Documents Marked as Confidential) Filed by Laronda Rasmussen (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-02T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Laronda Rasmussen (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-07-07T00:00:00Order - Dismissal Filed by Court
Date: 2020-03-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re Newly Filed Class Action)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-04-18T00:00:00Summons (on Amended Complaint (2nd)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-09-18T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Laronda Rasmussen (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-01-07T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Laronda Rasmussen (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-17T00:00:00Joint Status Conference Report (Regarding Discovery Plan) Filed by Laronda Rasmussen (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-01-07T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-08-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review re Renewal Fee of Pro Hac Vice App...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-07-30T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Laronda Rasmussen (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-04-02T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Laronda Rasmussen (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-03-12T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-06-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-01-14T00:00:00Proof of Service of Summons Filed by Laronda Rasmussen (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-10-15T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-01-13T00:00:00Message Board Posting (Notice of Continued Hearing) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-03-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-12-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review re Continuance of Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-06-30T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Laronda Rasmussen (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-12-23T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-09-08T00:00:00Notice of Continuance Filed by Laronda Rasmussen (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-17T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Laronda Rasmussen (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-11-06T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Filed by Laronda Rasmussen (Plaintiff); Karen Moore (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-04-22T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-08-11T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-04-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-07-10T00:00:00Proof of Service Filed by The Walt Disney Company (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-23T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (Regarding Briefing Schedule) Filed by Laronda Rasmussen (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-11-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Initial Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-07-02T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-09-23T00:00:00Answer (to Plaintiffs' Unverified Second Amended Complaint) Filed by The Walt Disney Company (Defendant)
Date: 2019-12-20T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Court Order re Newly Filed Class Action) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-04-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review re Renewal Fees of Pro Hac Vice Ap...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-07-31T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-10-17T00:00:00Notice of Lodging (of Documents Marked as Confidential) Filed by Laronda Rasmussen (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-10-26T00:00:00Proof of Service Filed by The Walt Disney Company (Defendant)
Date: 2020-09-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-03-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re Applications for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Re...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-08-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-12-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review re Continuance)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-04-21T00:00:00Proof of Service Filed by Laronda Rasmussen (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-10-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review re Resetting of Hearing on Motion ...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-09-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review re Request for Continuance; Resche...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-09-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Privilege Logs)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-09-25T00:00:00Message Board Posting (Re: Continued Hearing set for ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-11-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-10-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Continuance)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-10-07T00:00:00Joint Status Conference Statement Filed by The Walt Disney Company (Defendant)
Date: 2022-10-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re: Case Reassignment)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-06-20T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Laronda Rasmussen (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-05T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by The Walt Disney Company (Defendant)
Date: 2020-11-05T00:00:00Status Conference Statement Filed by Laronda Rasmussen (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference; Hearing - Other Privilege Logs)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-12-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review re Notice of Renewal/Payment of Pr...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-08-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-02-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-07-19T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-02-11T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by The Walt Disney Company (Defendant)
Date: 2021-02-09T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-02-22T00:00:00Notice of Lodging (of Document Conditionally) Filed by The Walt Disney Company (Defendant)
Date: 2021-02-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Continuance of Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-03-30T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-03-30T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-07-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing - Other Re: Sealing of Documents)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-05-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-09-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-05-12T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-08-31T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-04-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order RE: WTW Retainer Agreement)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-02-22T00:00:00Message Board Posting (Re: rescheduling hearing set for ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-02-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-02-11T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-10-07T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-10-21T00:00:00Joint Status Conference Statement Filed by The Walt Disney Company (Defendant)
Date: 2022-07-18T00:00:00Case Management Statement (Joint) Filed by The Walt Disney Company (Defendant)
Date: 2022-03-15T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-01-14T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-09-29T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re Initial Status Conference) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-06-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re. Continuance;)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-01-14T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail Filed by Laronda Rasmussen (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-10-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Recusal)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-06-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Informal Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-03-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re Initial Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-06-21T00:00:00Stipulation and Order Regarding Dismissal of Amy Hutchins' Claims Filed by Amy Hutchins (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-10-20T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-09-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Continuance of Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-10-21T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Unavailability) Filed by Laronda Rasmussen (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-10-04T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re: Case Reassignment) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-06-20T00:00:00Proof of Service Filed by Amy Hutchins (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-10-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Initial Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-07-25T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-06-06T00:00:00Initial Status Conference Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-06-21T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2019-04-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re Newly Filed Class Action))
Date: 2019-04-18T00:00:00Amended Complaint (and Demand For Jury Trial)
Date: 2019-04-02T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Court Order re Newly Filed Class Action) of )
Date: 2019-04-18T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2019-04-02T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2019-08-06T00:00:00Order (Granting Carson H. Sullivan's Verified Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Date: 2019-07-24T00:00:00Proof of Service of Summons
Date: 2019-10-15T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2019-11-06T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (Regarding Briefing Schedule)
Date: 2019-11-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike))
Date: 2019-12-11T00:00:00Notice of Appearance
Date: 2019-06-05T00:00:00Notice (of Carson H. Sullivan's verified Application for Admission for Pro Hac Vice)
Date: 2019-06-28T00:00:00Declaration (of Lori E. Andrus in Support of Joint Case Management Statement RE Discovery Plan)
Date: 2020-01-08T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2019-12-23T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2019-06-28T00:00:00Order - Dismissal
Date: 2020-03-10T00:00:00Message Board Posting (Notice of Continued Hearing)
Date: 2020-03-20T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-03-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review re Continuance))
Date: 2020-04-21T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-03-03T00:00:00Order (Granting Rebecca D. Farber's Verified Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Date: 2019-07-23T00:00:00Joint Case Management Conference Statement
Date: 2020-03-03T00:00:00Notice (Of New Time For Case Management Conference On March 10, 2020)
Date: 2020-03-04T00:00:00Joint Stipulation and Order Regarding Briefing Schedule
Date: 2019-07-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review re Renewal Fee of Pro Hac Vice App...))
Date: 2020-07-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Initial Status Conference))
Date: 2019-07-02T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service
Date: 2020-06-30T00:00:00Joint Case Management Conference Statement
Date: 2020-06-24T00:00:00Second Amended Complaint
Date: 2019-09-18T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2020-07-15T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (Regarding Confidential Information)
Date: 2019-08-27T00:00:00Summons (on Amended Complaint (2nd))
Date: 2019-09-18T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-07-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review re Continuance of Status Conference))
Date: 2020-06-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review re Renewal Fees of Pro Hac Vice Ap...))
Date: 2020-07-31T00:00:00Proof of Service
Date: 2020-08-14T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2019-10-17T00:00:00Proof of Service
Date: 2020-09-02T00:00:00Notice (of Carson H. Sullivan's Verified Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Date: 2020-08-14T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2019-11-21T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service
Date: 2020-01-13T00:00:00Joint Status Conference Report (Regarding Discovery Plan)
Date: 2020-01-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re Rescheduling of Status Conference))
Date: 2020-01-13T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-01-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re Applications for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Re...))
Date: 2020-08-24T00:00:00Status Conference Statement
Date: 2020-01-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference))
Date: 2020-01-14T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities (in Support of Notice of Rebecca D. Farber's Verified Application)
Date: 2020-08-14T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service
Date: 2020-08-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Privilege Logs))
Date: 2020-09-25T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-02-24T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (Regarding Third Amended Complaint)
Date: 2020-03-03T00:00:00Notice (Of Entry Of Stipulation And Order Regarding Third Amend Complaint)
Date: 2020-03-12T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore (, Linda Lee CSR# 13568)
Date: 2020-03-10T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-03-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review re Request for Continuance; Resche...))
Date: 2020-09-08T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-09-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review re Resetting of Hearing on Motion ...))
Date: 2020-09-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference))
Date: 2020-03-10T00:00:00Third Amended Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial
Date: 2020-03-11T00:00:00Message Board Posting (Re: Continuance of hearing)
Date: 2020-09-30T00:00:00Answer (to Plaintiffs' Unverified Third Amended Complaint)
Date: 2020-03-23T00:00:00Proof of Service
Date: 2021-02-05T00:00:00Notice of Lodging (of Documents Marked as Confidential)
Date: 2020-10-26T00:00:00Message Board Posting (Re: Continued Hearing set for )
Date: 2020-11-13T00:00:00[REDACTED] Joint Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-02-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter))
Date: 2021-02-11T00:00:00Message Board Posting (Re: rescheduling hearing set for )
Date: 2021-02-17T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name) (Defendant Doe 1, TWDC Enterprises 18 Corp.)
Date: 2020-07-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference))
Date: 2020-07-10T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore (Saba McKinley, CSR #9051)
Date: 2020-07-10T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (Amended Regarding Confidential Information)
Date: 2021-07-20T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore (Gail R. Davidson, CSR #12823)
Date: 2020-09-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference))
Date: 2021-05-12T00:00:00Carson H. Sullivan's Verified Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice
Date: 2020-08-14T00:00:00Plaintiffs' Opposition to Disney's Motion to Seal [REDACTED]
Date: 2021-05-05T00:00:00TWDC Enterprises 18 Corp.'s Answer to Plaintiffs' Unverified Third Amended Complaint
Date: 2020-08-07T00:00:00Notice (of Rebecca D. Farber's Verified Application for admission Pro Hac Vice)
Date: 2020-08-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference))
Date: 2021-02-18T00:00:00Notice of Lodging (of Documents Marked as Confidential)
Date: 2020-09-02T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities (in Support of Notice of Carson H. Sullivan's Verified Application)
Date: 2020-08-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order RE: WTW Retainer Agreement))
Date: 2021-02-22T00:00:00Notice of Lodging Of Documents Marked Confidential
Date: 2021-02-10T00:00:00Rebecca D. Farber's Verified Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice
Date: 2020-08-14T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore (Gail Peeples, CSR #11458)
Date: 2021-04-09T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-08-28T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service
Date: 2021-07-19T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service
Date: 2020-08-24T00:00:00Notice of Change of Handling Attorney
Date: 2021-11-12T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service
Date: 2020-09-08T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service
Date: 2021-02-22T00:00:00[REDACTED] The Walt Disney Company's Submission Regarding Privileged Statement of Work
Date: 2021-02-19T00:00:00Proof of Service
Date: 2021-10-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review re Notice of Renewal/Payment of Pr...))
Date: 2021-08-24T00:00:00Stipulation Waiving disqualification of judge pursuant to CCP Section 170.3 (B)(1)
Date: 2021-04-06T00:00:00Declaration (of Lori E. Andrus in Opposition to Disney's Motion to Seal)
Date: 2021-05-05T00:00:00Notice of Continuance
Date: 2020-09-17T00:00:00The Walt Disney Company's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel [REDACTED]
Date: 2020-09-11T00:00:00Proof of Service
Date: 2020-09-11T00:00:00Notice of Renewal and Payment of Pro Hac Vice Annual Fee for Carson H. Sullivan
Date: 2021-08-11T00:00:00Proof of Service
Date: 2020-09-18T00:00:00Notice of Lodging (of Documents Marked as Confidential)
Date: 2020-09-18T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service
Date: 2022-06-06T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service
Date: 2021-08-31T00:00:00Notice of Lodging (of Document Conditionally)
Date: 2021-02-09T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service
Date: 2020-09-23T00:00:00Proof of Service
Date: 2022-08-05T00:00:00Proof of Service
Date: 2020-10-26T00:00:00Joint Case Management Conference Statement
Date: 2020-12-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Informal Status Conference))
Date: 2022-03-16T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-02-09T00:00:00Order Granting Joseph M. Sellers? Verified Application For Admission Pro Hac Vice
Date: 2022-08-10T00:00:00Joint Status Conference Statement
Date: 2022-07-18T00:00:00Notice of Joseph M. Sellers' Verified Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice
Date: 2022-08-05T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-11-05T00:00:00Proof of Service
Date: 2020-12-23T00:00:00Order (Proposed Order Granting Christine E. Webber's' Verified Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Date: 2022-08-12T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Unavailability)
Date: 2021-10-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference))
Date: 2020-12-23T00:00:00Declaration (of Felicia A. Davis in Support of The Walt Disney Company's Opposition [REDACTED])
Date: 2021-02-09T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-11-05T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-05-05T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service
Date: 2021-10-21T00:00:00Stipulation and Order to use Certified Shorthand Reporter
Date: 2022-07-25T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service
Date: 2021-02-11T00:00:00Notice of Renewal and Payment of Pro Hac Vice Annual Fee for Rebecca D. Farber
Date: 2021-08-11T00:00:00[REDACTED] The Walt Disney Company's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Notice of Additional Evidence
Date: 2021-02-09T00:00:00Notice of Lodging (of Documents Marked as Confidential)
Date: 2021-02-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Initial Status Conference))
Date: 2022-07-25T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2021-10-04T00:00:00[REDACTED] Declaration OF Lori E. Andrus In Support Of Joint Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-02-10T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service
Date: 2022-01-14T00:00:00Proof Of Service
Date: 2021-02-10T00:00:00Joint Case Management Conference Statement
Date: 2022-01-10T00:00:00Joint Case Management Conference Statement
Date: 2021-04-02T00:00:00Notice (of Order Following Status Conference on July 25, 2022)
Date: 2022-07-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Continuance of Status Conference))
Date: 2021-03-30T00:00:00Proof of Service
Date: 2021-02-19T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (Regarding Fourth Amended Complaint)
Date: 2021-03-25T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service
Date: 2021-03-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference))
Date: 2021-04-09T00:00:00Amended Complaint ((4th))
Date: 2021-04-13T00:00:00Defendants' Answer to Plaintiffs' unverified Fourth Amended Complaint
Date: 2021-05-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing - Other Re: Sealing of Documents))
Date: 2021-05-21T00:00:00Notice of Lodging (of Documents Marked as Confidential)
Date: 2021-05-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference))
Date: 2021-09-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Continuance of Status Conference))
Date: 2021-10-21T00:00:00Stipulation and Order Regarding Dismissal of Amy Hutchins' Claims
Date: 2021-10-20T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2021-05-21T00:00:00Joint Case Management Conference Statement
Date: 2021-05-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference))
Date: 2021-07-19T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service
Date: 2021-09-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re. Continuance;))
Date: 2022-01-14T00:00:00Corrected Fourth Amended Complaint
Date: 2021-04-15T00:00:00Case Management Statement (Joint Conference)
Date: 2021-10-18T00:00:00Joint Case Management Conference Statement
Date: 2021-09-07T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2022-08-05T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2022-07-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Recusal))
Date: 2022-06-06T00:00:00Order ([Proposed] Order Authorizing Electronic Service)
Date: 2022-08-01T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2022-09-29T00:00:00Joseph M. Sellers' Verified Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice
Date: 2022-08-05T00:00:00Initial Status Conference Order
Date: 2022-06-21T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re Initial Status Conference) of )
Date: 2022-06-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re Initial Status Conference))
Date: 2022-06-21T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re: Case Reassignment) of )
Date: 2022-06-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re: Case Reassignment))
Date: 2022-06-20T00:00:00Joint Case Management Conference Statement
Date: 2022-06-02T00:00:00Case Management Statement (Joint)
Date: 2022-03-15T00:00:00Application (Christine Webber's Verified Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Date: 2022-08-05T00:00:00Notice (Notice Of Christine E. Webber?s Verified Application For Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Date: 2022-08-05T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2022-08-05T00:00:00Answer (to Plaintiffs' Unverified Second Amended Complaint)
Date: 2019-12-20T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2019-11-01T00:00:00Demurrer to Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint
Date: 2019-10-18T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2019-04-02T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2019-04-02T00:00:00Initial Status Conference Order
Date: 2019-04-18T00:00:00Application to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice
Date: 2019-06-18T00:00:00Notice (Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order)
Date: 2019-10-22T00:00:00Declaration (of Lori E. Andrus in support of Plaintiffs' opposition to defendants' Demurrer)
Date: 2019-11-21T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) (re Minute Order Re Newly Filed Class Action)
Date: 2019-04-29T00:00:00Notice (of Rebecca D. Farber's verified Application for Admission for Pro Hac Vice)
Date: 2019-06-28T00:00:00Notice of Intent to Appear by Telephone
Date: 2020-02-24T00:00:00Application to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice
Date: 2019-06-18T00:00:00Joint Initial Status Conference Class Action Response Statement
Date: 2019-06-18T00:00:00Proof of Service
Date: 2020-11-10T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service
Date: 2020-04-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference; Hearing - Other Privilege Logs))
Date: 2020-12-15T00:00:00Status Conference Statement
Date: 2020-11-05T00:00:00Amended Complaint (and Demand For Jury Trial)
Date: 2019-04-02T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Court Order re Newly Filed Class Action) of 04/18/2019)
Date: 2019-04-18T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2019-04-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re Newly Filed Class Action))
Date: 2019-04-18T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) (re Minute Order Re Newly Filed Class Action)
Date: 2019-04-29T00:00:00Notice (of Carson H. Sullivan's verified Application for Admission for Pro Hac Vice)
Date: 2019-06-28T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2019-06-28T00:00:00Notice (of Rebecca D. Farber's verified Application for Admission for Pro Hac Vice)
Date: 2019-06-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Initial Status Conference))
Date: 2019-07-02T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (Regarding Confidential Information)
Date: 2019-08-27T00:00:00Order (Granting Rebecca D. Farber's Verified Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Date: 2019-07-23T00:00:00Order (Granting Carson H. Sullivan's Verified Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Date: 2019-07-24T00:00:00Summons (on Amended Complaint (2nd))
Date: 2019-09-18T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (Regarding Briefing Schedule)
Date: 2019-11-01T00:00:00Notice (Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order)
Date: 2019-10-22T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2019-11-01T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2019-11-06T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2019-11-21T00:00:00Declaration (of Lori E. Andrus in support of Plaintiffs' opposition to defendants' Demurrer)
Date: 2019-11-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike))
Date: 2019-12-11T00:00:00Answer (to Plaintiffs' Unverified Second Amended Complaint)
Date: 2019-12-20T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-01-07T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2019-12-23T00:00:00Joint Status Conference Report (Regarding Discovery Plan)
Date: 2020-01-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re Rescheduling of 01/14/2020 Status Conference))
Date: 2020-01-13T00:00:00Declaration (of Lori E. Andrus in Support of Joint Case Management Statement RE Discovery Plan)
Date: 2020-01-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference))
Date: 2020-01-14T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-02-24T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-03-03T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (Regarding Third Amended Complaint)
Date: 2020-03-03T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-03-04T00:00:00Notice (Of New Time For Case Management Conference On March 10, 2020)
Date: 2020-03-04T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore (, Linda Lee CSR# 13568)
Date: 2020-03-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference))
Date: 2020-03-10T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-03-12T00:00:00Message Board Posting (Notice of Continued Hearing)
Date: 2020-03-20T00:00:00Notice (Of Entry Of Stipulation And Order Regarding Third Amend Complaint)
Date: 2020-03-12T00:00:00Answer (to Plaintiffs' Unverified Third Amended Complaint)
Date: 2020-03-23T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities (in Support of Notice of Rebecca D. Farber's Verified Application)
Date: 2020-08-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re Applications for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Re...))
Date: 2020-08-24T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-08-28T00:00:00Notice of Lodging (of Documents Marked as Confidential)
Date: 2020-09-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review re Request for Continuance; Resche...))
Date: 2020-09-08T00:00:00The Walt Disney Company's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel [REDACTED]
Date: 2020-09-11T00:00:00Notice of Lodging (of Documents Marked as Confidential)
Date: 2020-09-18T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-09-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Privilege Logs))
Date: 2020-09-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review re Resetting of Hearing on Motion ...))
Date: 2020-09-23T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore (Gail R. Davidson, CSR #12823)
Date: 2020-09-25T00:00:00Message Board Posting (Re: Continuance of 10/7/20 hearing)
Date: 2020-09-30T00:00:00Notice of Lodging (of Documents Marked as Confidential)
Date: 2020-10-26T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-11-05T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-11-05T00:00:00Message Board Posting (Re: Continued Hearing set for 11/13/20)
Date: 2020-11-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference; Hearing - Other Privilege Logs))
Date: 2020-12-15T00:00:00Notice of Lodging (of Document Conditionally)
Date: 2021-02-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference))
Date: 2020-12-23T00:00:00Declaration (of Felicia A. Davis in Support of The Walt Disney Company's Opposition [REDACTED])
Date: 2021-02-09T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-02-09T00:00:00Notice of Lodging (of Documents Marked as Confidential)
Date: 2021-02-05T00:00:00[REDACTED] The Walt Disney Company's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Notice of Additional Evidence
Date: 2021-02-09T00:00:00[REDACTED] Joint Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-02-10T00:00:00[REDACTED] Declaration OF Lori E. Andrus In Support Of Joint Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-02-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter))
Date: 2021-02-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference))
Date: 2021-02-18T00:00:00Message Board Posting (Re: rescheduling hearing set for 2/18/21)
Date: 2021-02-17T00:00:00[REDACTED] The Walt Disney Company's Submission Regarding Privileged Statement of Work
Date: 2021-02-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order RE: WTW Retainer Agreement))
Date: 2021-02-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Continuance of Status Conference))
Date: 2021-03-30T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (Regarding Fourth Amended Complaint)
Date: 2021-03-25T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore (Gail Peeples, CSR #11458)
Date: 2021-04-09T00:00:00Stipulation Waiving disqualification of judge pursuant to CCP Section 170.3 (B)(1)
Date: 2021-04-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference))
Date: 2021-04-09T00:00:00Amended Complaint ((4th))
Date: 2021-04-13T00:00:00Declaration (of Lori E. Andrus in Opposition to Disney's Motion to Seal)
Date: 2021-05-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference))
Date: 2021-07-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference))
Date: 2021-09-13T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-05-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review re Notice of Renewal/Payment of Pr...))
Date: 2021-08-24T00:00:00Notice of Lodging (of Documents Marked as Confidential)
Date: 2021-05-05T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Unavailability)
Date: 2021-10-04T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (Amended Regarding Confidential Information)
Date: 2021-07-20T00:00:00Plaintiffs' Opposition to Disney's Motion to Seal [REDACTED]
Date: 2021-05-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference))
Date: 2021-05-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing - Other Re: Sealing of Documents))
Date: 2021-05-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Informal Status Conference))
Date: 2022-03-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re. Continuance;))
Date: 2022-01-14T00:00:00Case Management Statement (Joint)
Date: 2022-03-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Continuance of Status Conference))
Date: 2021-10-21T00:00:00Case Management Statement (Joint Conference)
Date: 2021-10-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review re Continuance))
Date: 2020-04-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review re Continuance of Status Conference))
Date: 2020-06-30T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name) (Defendant Doe 1, TWDC Enterprises 18 Corp.)
Date: 2020-07-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference))
Date: 2020-07-10T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-07-07T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore (Saba McKinley, CSR #9051)
Date: 2020-07-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review re Renewal Fee of Pro Hac Vice App...))
Date: 2020-07-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review re Renewal Fees of Pro Hac Vice Ap...))
Date: 2020-07-31T00:00:00Notice (of Carson H. Sullivan's Verified Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Date: 2020-08-14T00:00:00Notice (of Rebecca D. Farber's Verified Application for admission Pro Hac Vice)
Date: 2020-08-14T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities (in Support of Notice of Carson H. Sullivan's Verified Application)
Date: 2020-08-14T00:00:00Amended Complaint ( (4th))
Date: 2021-04-13T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.