Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Oyekan Richard Phd, filed a(n) Elder Abuse - Torts case represented by Moriel David, Ogbogu Samuel, against Godinez Maria De Los Angeles, Godinez Martin, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Brenda M. Penny presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBrenda M. Penny Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 22, 2019 |
CategoryElder Abuse/Dependent Adult Abuse Case (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeElder Abuse |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-02-22T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-03-21T00:00:00Notice of Related Case; Filed by: RICHARD OYEKAN, PhD (Petitioner)
Date: 2019-03-28T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-05-06T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-05-03T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Status Conference) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: December 28, 2020Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-05-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference))
Date: 2020-01-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference))
Date: 2020-08-19T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2019-02-22T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2019-02-22T00:00:00Notice of Related Case
Date: 2019-03-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re Related Cases: Oyekan, et al v. Godinez (19STC...))
Date: 2019-04-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order))
Date: 2019-06-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference))
Date: December 28, 2020Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2019-02-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2019-05-03T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Court Order) of 05/03/2019)
Date: 2019-05-03T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2019-02-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference))
Date: 2019-09-24T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2019-03-21T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 05/06/2020)
Date: 2020-05-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference))
Date: 2019-06-07T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Status Conference) of 12/28/2020)
Date: December 28, 2020Minute Order ( (Status Conference))
Date: 2019-05-23T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.