Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
Sanft Moises Sr, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Ryan Michael James, Stearns Ryan E, against Sanft David, Sanft Jacqueline, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Robert S. Wada presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRobert S. Wada Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 23, 2019 |
CategoryOther Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-01-23T00:00:00Notice of Related Case; Filed by: David Sanft (Defendant)
Date: 2019-03-14T00:00:00Association of Attorney; Filed by: Moises Sanft, SR (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-03-28T00:00:00PI General Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-03-19T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: David Sanft (Defendant)
Date: April 17, 2019Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-04-17T00:00:00PI General Order
Date: 2019-03-19T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2019-01-23T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2019-01-23T00:00:00Answer (to Unverified Complaint for Elder Financial And Mental Abuse; Conversion)
Date: 2019-03-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re Notice of Related Cases Re Sanft v. Sanft, et ...))
Date: 2019-04-10T00:00:00Notice of Related Case
Date: 2019-03-14T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2019-02-28T00:00:00Association of Attorney
Date: 2019-03-28T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service
Date: August 13, 2019Complaint
Date: 2019-01-23T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order] and Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates)
Date: 2019-03-19T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2019-01-23T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.