Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Ahdoot Alan, La Rue General Contractors Inc., filed a(n) Other Civil Petition (General Jurisdiction) case represented by Kenegos Joan, Sayre Federico C, against La Rue General Contractors Inc., La Rue William Richard, Rummerfield Jaime, Woodson Ron, Woodson & Rummerfield'S House Of Design, (total of 5) See All represented by Corey Edward Eugene, Jeffery Mona, Jones Dennis N, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Michelle Williams Court presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMichelle Williams Court Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management128 days |
Filing DateOctober 21, 2019 |
CategoryOther Civil Petition (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 20, 2023 |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions248 days |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
||
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Association of Attorney; Filed by: La Rue General Contractors, Inc., (Respondent)
Date: 2020-01-31T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order re Trial Continuance) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-08-05T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: William Richard La Rue (Respondent)
Date: 2020-01-13T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: William Richard La Rue (Respondent)
Date: 2020-01-13T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Alan Ahdoot (Petitioner)
Date: 2020-02-11T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-09-29T00:00:00Notice of Settlement; Filed by: Alan Ahdoot (Petitioner); Vacate Future Dates: No
Date: 2021-10-11T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order re Notice of Settlement) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-10-15T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2019-10-21T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2019-10-21T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2019-10-21T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2020-01-13T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2019-10-24T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-10-21T00:00:00On the Complaint filed by Alan Ahdoot on , entered Order for Dismissal without prejudice, does 1-25
Date: 2020-08-03T00:00:00Notice of Ruling AT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Filed by: Alan Ahdoot (Petitioner)
Date: 2020-02-26T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: Alan Ahdoot (Petitioner)
Date: 2021-06-07T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order re Continuance of Trial) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-03-04T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-10-29T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-10-29T00:00:00Notice of Limited Scope Representation; Filed by: La Rue General Contractors, Inc., (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2020-02-06T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-02-11T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service
Date: 2019-10-29T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2019-10-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Post-Mediation Status Conference))
Date: 2020-10-13T00:00:00Association of Attorney
Date: 2020-01-31T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2020-12-10T00:00:00Notice of Limited Scope Representation
Date: 2020-02-06T00:00:00Summons (on Cross Complaint)
Date: 2020-04-21T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2020-10-21T00:00:00Notice of Ruling (AT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: 2020-02-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Entry of Default/Default Judgment; Or...))
Date: 2020-06-25T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-02-11T00:00:00Cross-Complaint
Date: 2019-12-16T00:00:00Notice (of Continuance of Post Mediation Status Conference)
Date: 2020-10-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service As T...))
Date: 2020-01-14T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-06-23T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-08-04T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-01-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Post-Mediation Status Conference))
Date: 2021-02-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review re dismissal of unserved/unnamed Does))
Date: 2020-08-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Entry of Default/Default Judgment))
Date: 2020-08-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure t...))
Date: 2020-02-26T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: 2020-08-26T00:00:00Summons (on Cross Complaint)
Date: 2020-09-29T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re Continuance of Trial) of 03/04/2021)
Date: 2021-03-04T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (for a Trial Continuance)
Date: 2021-08-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re Continuance of Trial))
Date: 2021-03-04T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re Trial Continuance) of 08/05/2021)
Date: 2021-08-05T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (Ex Parte Application for Order re Filing First Amended Complaint)
Date: 2021-04-01T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (re Filing First Amended Cross-Complaint)
Date: 2021-03-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for Order re Filing First Ame...))
Date: 2021-04-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re Trial Continuance))
Date: 2021-08-05T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2021-06-07T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (for Order Permitting Filing of First Amended Cross Complaint)
Date: 2021-09-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re Striking Stipulation and Order re Filing First...))
Date: 2021-05-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for Order Permitting Filing o...))
Date: 2021-09-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for Order re Filing First Ame...))
Date: 2021-04-06T00:00:00Order (granting stipulation to continue Trial, the Final Status Conference and Pretrial Discovery)
Date: 2021-03-03T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2020-10-16T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service
Date: 2020-10-23T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (re Filing First Amended Cross-Complaint)
Date: 2021-03-11T00:00:00Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt
Date: 2020-01-02T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2020-06-11T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2019-11-12T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.