Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Orrego Mizrain, filed a(n) Writ - Administrative Mandamus (General Jurisdiction) case represented by Lawrence Sherry Hovind, Rabe Robert, against Los Angeles County Civil Service Commission, represented by Carmichael Daniel Claude, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Mary H. Strobel presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMary H. Strobel Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 23, 2019 |
CategoryWrit - Administrative Mandamus (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 17, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-10-23T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-10-24T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Mizrain Orrego (Petitioner)
Date: 2019-10-23T00:00:00Notice of Trial Setting Conference and Attached Orders Thereon; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-10-24T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (COURT ORDER) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-02-18T00:00:00Brief Petitioner Mizrain Orrego's Opening Brief; Filed by: Mizrain Orrego (Petitioner)
Date: 2022-11-18T00:00:00Notice of Trial Setting Conference and Attached Orders Thereon; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-10-23T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-10-24T00:00:00Updated -- Notice of Related Case: Filed By: Mizrain Orrego (Petitioner); Result: Granted; Result Date:
Date: 2021-04-01T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (COURT ORDER) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-04-01T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Mizrain Orrego (Petitioner)
Date: 2021-04-28T00:00:00Notice of Lodging Administrative Record; Filed by: Mizrain Orrego (Petitioner)
Date: 2023-01-06T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Mizrain Orrego (Petitioner)
Date: 2022-03-18T00:00:00Notice of Lodging Trial Notebook; Filed by: Mizrain Orrego (Petitioner)
Date: 2023-01-06T00:00:00Reply Petitioner Mizrain Orrego's Reply to Opposition Brief; Filed by: Mizrain Orrego (Petitioner)
Date: 2023-01-06T00:00:00Order to Show Cause (Hearing); Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-03-17T00:00:00Notice of Lodging Joint Appendix of Administrative Record; Filed by: Mizrain Orrego (Petitioner)
Date: 2023-01-06T00:00:00Notice of Trial Setting Conference and Attached Orders Thereon
Date: 2019-10-23T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2019-10-23T00:00:00Summons (on Petition)
Date: 2019-10-23T00:00:00Petition for Writ of Mandate
Date: 2019-10-23T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2019-10-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2019-10-24T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings
Date: 2019-10-24T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 10/24/2019)
Date: 2019-10-24T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)
Date: 2019-10-23T00:00:00Notice of Trial Setting Conference and Attached Orders Thereon
Date: 2019-10-24T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2019-10-29T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-04-28T00:00:00Notice of Related Case
Date: 2021-03-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE))
Date: 2020-02-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW))
Date: 2020-09-30T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (to Continue Trial Date)
Date: 2020-09-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (EX PARTE APPLICATION OF PETITIONER, MIZRAIN ORREGO, TO VACATE...))
Date: 2021-04-28T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (Petitioner's Ex Parte Motion To Vacate and Reset Trial Date)
Date: 2021-04-28T00:00:00Amended Complaint
Date: 2020-12-16T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2019-11-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (COURT ORDER))
Date: 2021-04-01T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((COURT ORDER) of 04/01/2021)
Date: 2021-04-01T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-04-06T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((COURT ORDER) of 02/18/2022)
Date: 2022-02-18T00:00:00Amended Petition (1st)
Date: 2020-12-16T00:00:00Notice (Following Status Conference)
Date: 2021-05-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (STATUS CONFERENCE))
Date: 2021-05-04T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2021-01-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (COURT ORDER))
Date: 2022-02-18T00:00:00Minute Order ((Non-Appearance Case Review))
Date: 2022-03-14T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.