Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Aids Healthcare Foundation A California Corporation, filed a(n) Civil case represented by Bhimani Arti L, against City Of Los Angeles, Doe Respondents 1 Through 10, Office Of Los Angeles Mayor Eric Garcetti, represented by Wilson Bethelwel, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Mary H. Strobel presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMary H. Strobel Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 20, 2019 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedOctober 18, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-09-20T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: AIDS Healthcare Foundation, a California Corporation (Petitioner)
Date: 2020-11-10T00:00:00Notice of Trial Setting Conference and Attached Orders Thereon; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-09-24T00:00:00Notice of Trial Setting Conference and Attached Orders Thereon Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-09-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-01-09T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by AIDS Healthcare Foundation, a California Corporation (Petitioner)
Date: 2019-09-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (HEARING ON PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-10-29T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by AIDS Healthcare Foundation, a California Corporation (Petitioner)
Date: 2020-11-10T00:00:00Summons (on Petition) Filed by AIDS Healthcare Foundation, a California Corporation (Petitioner)
Date: 2019-09-20T00:00:00Answer Filed by City of Los Angeles (Respondent); Office of Los Angeles Mayor Eric Garcetti (Respondent)
Date: 2020-01-06T00:00:00Judgment Filed by AIDS Healthcare Foundation, a California Corporation (Petitioner)
Date: 2021-01-07T00:00:00Trial Brief Filed by AIDS Healthcare Foundation, a California Corporation (Petitioner)
Date: 2020-08-28T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-09-20T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Filed by AIDS Healthcare Foundation, a California Corporation (Petitioner)
Date: 2019-11-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (STATUS CONFERENCE)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-12-10T00:00:00Trial Brief
Date: 2020-08-28T00:00:00Notice of Trial Setting Conference and Attached Orders Thereon
Date: 2019-09-24T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2019-09-20T00:00:00Notice (of Trial Setting Minute Order)
Date: 2020-08-27T00:00:00Opposition (to Petition for Writ of Mandate)
Date: 2020-10-28T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-01-06T00:00:00Declaration (of Bethelwel Wilson in Support of Opposition to Petition for Writ of Mandate)
Date: 2020-10-28T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2019-11-21T00:00:00Declaration (of Arti L. Bhimani in Support of AHF?s Petition for Writ of Mandate)
Date: 2020-10-15T00:00:00Summons (on Petition)
Date: 2019-09-20T00:00:00Petition for Writ of Mandate
Date: 2019-09-20T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2020-11-10T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2019-09-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (HEARING ON PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE))
Date: 2020-10-29T00:00:00Reply (Reply Brief re Writ of Mandate)
Date: 2020-10-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE))
Date: 2020-01-09T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.