Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Liu Huasha, Maheshwari Sandeepa, filed a(n) Writ - Administrative Mandamus (General Jurisdiction) case represented by Holder Lisa, Olney Brian D., Newman Robert, Newman Robert Dexter, Stormer Dan Lewis, (total of 5) See All against Board Of Administration, Board Of Administration California Public Employees Retirement System, Southern California Association Of Governments, California Public Employees Retirement System, represented by Ananian Alina Anette, Katzir Amit, Levin Jason, Salter Remi Taylor, Yelland Elizabeth Anne, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Mary H. Strobel presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMary H. Strobel Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 19, 2019 |
CategoryWrit - Administrative Mandamus (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 17, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Association of Attorney; Filed by: Huasha Liu (Petitioner)
Date: 2020-01-29T00:00:00Notice of Trial Setting Conference and Attached Orders Thereon; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-09-20T00:00:00Notice of Lodging Administrative Record; Filed by: Huasha Liu (Petitioner)
Date: 2020-11-23T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-09-19T00:00:00Administrative Record (Volume 2 of 2); Filed by: Huasha Liu (Petitioner)
Date: 2020-11-23T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-12-14T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-07-25T00:00:00Order - Joint Stipulation and Order Re Stay of Writ; Signed and Filed by: Huasha Liu (Petitioner)
Date: 2021-02-09T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by: Jason Levin (Attorney)
Date: 2022-05-20T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-07-14T00:00:00Message Board Posting Case Anywhere - 11:00 AM Informal Discovery Conference (IDC); Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-01-11T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-08-17T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment; Filed by: Huasha Liu (Petitioner); Sandeepa Maheshwari (Petitioner)
Date: 2022-07-26T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re. Case Reassignment;) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-07-25T00:00:00Message Board Posting Case Anywhere Thread - Request for Informal Discovery Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-12-19T00:00:00Notice of Appearance of Counsel; Filed by: Southern California Association of Governments (Respondent)
Date: 2020-03-06T00:00:00Initial Status Conference Order; Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-02-28T00:00:00Notice of Transfer to complex Litigation Program; Filed by: Huasha Liu (Petitioner)
Date: 2020-02-07T00:00:00Administrative Record (Volume 1 of 2); Filed by: Huasha Liu (Petitioner)
Date: 2020-11-23T00:00:00Petitioner's Opening Brief per CCP ¿ 1094.5; Filed by: Huasha Liu (Petitioner)
Date: 2020-10-09T00:00:00Petitioner's Reply Per CCP Section 1094.5; Filed by: Huasha Liu (Petitioner)
Date: 2020-11-23T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re Electronic Service) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-06-18T00:00:00Notice of court order RE: Electronic service; Filed by: Huasha Liu (Petitioner)
Date: 2020-06-26T00:00:00Notice of Motion re Petitioner's Opening Brief per CCP ¿ 1094.5; Filed by: Huasha Liu (Petitioner)
Date: 2020-10-09T00:00:00Request for Refund / Order; Filed by: Southern California Association of Governments (Respondent)
Date: 2020-02-07T00:00:00Message Board Posting Case Anywhere Thread - Request for Informal Discovery Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-07-12T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-06-15T00:00:00Notice of Reassignment to Complex Litigation Court; Filed by:
Date: 2020-02-21T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order Continuing Hearing) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-04-21T00:00:00Petitioner's Response re Objections to Requests for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Huasha Liu (Petitioner)
Date: 2020-11-23T00:00:00Notice of Court Order; Filed by: Huasha Liu (Petitioner)
Date: 2020-03-04T00:00:00STATUS CONFERENCE STATEMENT; Filed by: Huasha Liu (Petitioner)
Date: 2020-01-29T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re. Case Reassignment;) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-08-05T00:00:00Status Report Joint; Filed by: Huasha Liu (Petitioner); Sandeepa Maheshwari (Petitioner)
Date: 2022-09-30T00:00:00Joint Status Conference Statement; Filed by: Huasha Liu (Petitioner)
Date: 2021-01-22T00:00:00Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE. CASE REASSIGNMENT;)
Date: July 25, 2022Notice - NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT
Date: July 26, 2022Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - AMENDED PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: July 29, 2022Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)
Date: August 02, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE. CASE REASSIGNMENT;)
Date: August 05, 2022Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service
Date: August 17, 2022Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER RE CASE REASSIGNMENT
Date: August 15, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: August 17, 2022Reply - DEFENDANTS REPLY IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER
Date: September 29, 2022Status Report - STATUS REPORT JOINT
Date: September 30, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE; HEARING ON MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER)
Date: October 06, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (IDC))
Date: January 13, 2023Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF JAMES RAMIREZ
Date: February 14, 2023Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: March 14, 2023Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2019-09-19T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2019-09-19T00:00:00Petition for Writ of Mandate
Date: 2019-09-19T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2019-10-11T00:00:00Notice (of Transfer to complex Litigation Program)
Date: 2020-02-07T00:00:001st Amended Petition
Date: 2020-01-10T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (extending deadline to respond to petition)
Date: 2019-11-14T00:00:00STATUS CONFERENCE STATEMENT
Date: 2020-01-29T00:00:00Request for Refund / Order
Date: 2020-02-07T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2020-01-27T00:00:00Summons (on Petition)
Date: 2019-09-19T00:00:001st Amended Summons
Date: 2020-01-10T00:00:00Association of Attorney
Date: 2020-01-29T00:00:00Notice of Trial Setting Conference and Attached Orders Thereon
Date: 2019-09-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE))
Date: 2020-01-14T00:00:00Notice (of Errata (Second))
Date: 2020-02-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE))
Date: 2020-02-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re Reassignment to Complex Litigation Court))
Date: 2020-02-10T00:00:00Notice (of Court Order)
Date: 2020-03-04T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re Reassignment to Complex Litigation Court) of )
Date: 2020-02-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re Newly Assigned Case))
Date: 2020-02-28T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re Newly Assigned Case) of , Initial Status Conference)
Date: 2020-02-28T00:00:00Initial Status Conference Order
Date: 2020-02-28T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Continuing Hearing) of )
Date: 2020-04-21T00:00:00Notice (of Exemption from Fees Pursuant to government Code Section 6103)
Date: 2020-03-06T00:00:00Notice of Appearance (of Counsel)
Date: 2020-03-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Continuing Hearing))
Date: 2020-04-21T00:00:00Joint Status Conference Statement
Date: 2020-07-20T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re Electronic Service) of )
Date: 2020-06-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Initial Status Conference))
Date: 2020-07-24T00:00:00Order (Authorizing Electronic Service (Case Anywhere))
Date: 2020-07-24T00:00:00Notice of court order RE: Electronic service
Date: 2020-06-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re Electronic Service))
Date: 2020-06-18T00:00:00Notice (of Withdrawal of Calpers' Motion for Judgment On the Pleadings)
Date: 2020-11-16T00:00:00Calpers' Opposition to Writ of Mandate (CCP Section 1094.5)
Date: 2020-11-09T00:00:00Petitioner's Opening Brief per CCP ¿ 1094.5
Date: 2020-10-09T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2021-01-15T00:00:00Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings
Date: 2020-11-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Jury Trial Re: Writ of Mandamus; Hearing on Motion - Othe...))
Date: 2020-12-08T00:00:00Notice of Lodging (Administrative Record)
Date: 2020-11-23T00:00:00Joint Status Conference Statement
Date: 2021-01-22T00:00:00Notice of Motion (re Petitioner's Opening Brief per CCP ¿ 1094.5)
Date: 2020-10-09T00:00:00Calpers' Opposition to Petitioner's Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2020-11-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion - Other Re: Petitioner's Opening Brief Per ...))
Date: 2020-12-10T00:00:00Order (Granting Petitioner's Motion to Issue A Writ of Mandate Directed to Respondent)
Date: 2020-12-14T00:00:00Petitioner's Response re Objections to Requests for Judicial Notice
Date: 2020-11-23T00:00:00Administrative Record (Volume 1 of 2)
Date: 2020-11-23T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service
Date: 2020-12-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter))
Date: 2020-12-14T00:00:00Petitioner's Reply Per CCP Section 1094.5
Date: 2020-11-23T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice (in Support of Petitioner's Opening Brief Per CCP ¿ 1094.5)
Date: 2020-10-09T00:00:00Administrative Record (Volume 2 of 2)
Date: 2020-11-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC)))
Date: 2022-01-05T00:00:00Declaration (of Brian Olney in Support of The Joint Status Conference Statement)
Date: 2021-01-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC)))
Date: 2021-07-29T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore (Marco Neilly, CSR# 13564)
Date: 2021-09-30T00:00:00Petitioner's Opposition to Respondent Calpers' Demurrer to Second Amended Petition
Date: 2021-05-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer))
Date: 2021-09-30T00:00:00Order (- Joint Stipulation and Order Re Stay of Writ)
Date: 2021-02-09T00:00:00Joint Stipulation and Order re Motion by Petitioners For Leave to File Fourth Amended Petition
Date: 2021-12-09T00:00:00Amended Petition (2nd)
Date: 2021-02-16T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration of Brian Olney in Support of Petitioners' Objection and Motion to Strike)
Date: 2021-09-27T00:00:00Petitioner's Opposition to Respondent Calpers' Demurer to Third Amended Petition
Date: 2021-09-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Extending Time to Amend Petition))
Date: 2021-07-20T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore (Alicia Renee Desmond)
Date: 2021-05-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference))
Date: 2021-01-29T00:00:00Third Amended Petition for Writ of Mandate
Date: 2021-08-13T00:00:00Stipulation and Order ((Joint) - RE Second Amended Petition)
Date: 2021-03-02T00:00:00Declaration of Remi Salter in Support of CALPER's Demurrer to Second Amended Petition
Date: 2021-03-17T00:00:00CALPERS' Reply In Support OF Demurrer To Second Amended Complaint
Date: 2021-05-19T00:00:00Request For Judicial Notice In Support Of Calpers' Demurrer To Third Amended Petition
Date: 2021-09-02T00:00:00Declaration Of Remi Salter In Support Of Calpers' Demurrer To Third Amended Petition
Date: 2021-09-02T00:00:00Calpers' Notice of Demurrer and Demurrer to Third Amended Petition
Date: 2021-09-02T00:00:00Joint Statement re Discovery Dispute
Date: 2021-07-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference Re: Discovery))
Date: 2021-10-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Further Status Conference; Hearing on Demurrer to Second Amen...))
Date: 2021-05-26T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice (in support of Calpers' Demurrer to Second Amended Petition)
Date: 2021-03-17T00:00:00Order (Overruling Defendants' Demurrer to Petitioners' Third Amended Petition for Writ of Mandate)
Date: 2021-09-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC)))
Date: 2021-08-26T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2022-03-23T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (Joint Stipulation and Order Re Third and Fourth Amended Petitions)
Date: 2022-02-07T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Order on Joint Stipulation Re Third and Fourth Amended Petitions
Date: 2022-04-29T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2022-05-20T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2022-03-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC)))
Date: 2022-01-14T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (Re: Protective Order)
Date: 2022-01-27T00:00:00Summons (on Petition)
Date: 2019-09-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE))
Date: 2020-01-14T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (extending deadline to respond to petition)
Date: 2019-11-14T00:00:00Notice (of Errata (Second))
Date: 2020-02-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE))
Date: 2020-02-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re Reassignment to Complex Litigation Court))
Date: 2020-02-10T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re Reassignment to Complex Litigation Court) of 02/10/2020)
Date: 2020-02-10T00:00:00Notice (of Transfer to complex Litigation Program)
Date: 2020-02-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re Newly Assigned Case))
Date: 2020-02-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Continuing Hearing))
Date: 2020-04-21T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Continuing Hearing) of 04/21/2020)
Date: 2020-04-21T00:00:00Notice (of Court Order)
Date: 2020-03-04T00:00:00Notice (of Exemption from Fees Pursuant to government Code Section 6103)
Date: 2020-03-06T00:00:00Notice of Appearance (of Counsel)
Date: 2020-03-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re Electronic Service))
Date: 2020-06-18T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re Electronic Service) of 06/18/2020)
Date: 2020-06-18T00:00:00Notice of Motion (re Petitioner's Opening Brief per CCP ¿ 1094.5)
Date: 2020-10-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Initial Status Conference))
Date: 2020-07-24T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice (in Support of Petitioner's Opening Brief Per CCP ¿ 1094.5)
Date: 2020-10-09T00:00:00Order (Authorizing Electronic Service (Case Anywhere))
Date: 2020-07-24T00:00:00Calpers' Opposition to Writ of Mandate (CCP Section 1094.5)
Date: 2020-11-09T00:00:00Notice (of Withdrawal of Calpers' Motion for Judgment On the Pleadings)
Date: 2020-11-16T00:00:00Administrative Record (Volume 2 of 2)
Date: 2020-11-23T00:00:00Notice of Lodging (Administrative Record)
Date: 2020-11-23T00:00:00Administrative Record (Volume 1 of 2)
Date: 2020-11-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion - Other Re: Petitioner's Opening Brief Per ...))
Date: 2020-12-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Jury Trial Re: Writ of Mandamus; Hearing on Motion - Othe...))
Date: 2020-12-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Extending Time to Amend Petition))
Date: 2021-07-20T00:00:00Order (- Joint Stipulation and Order Re Stay of Writ)
Date: 2021-02-09T00:00:00Stipulation and Order ((Joint) - RE Second Amended Petition)
Date: 2021-03-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter))
Date: 2020-12-14T00:00:00Amended Petition (2nd)
Date: 2021-02-16T00:00:00Declaration (of Brian Olney in Support of The Joint Status Conference Statement)
Date: 2021-01-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference))
Date: 2021-01-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Further Status Conference; Hearing on Demurrer to Second Amen...))
Date: 2021-05-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC)))
Date: 2021-08-26T00:00:00Order (Granting Petitioner's Motion to Issue A Writ of Mandate Directed to Respondent)
Date: 2020-12-14T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore (Alicia Renee Desmond)
Date: 2021-05-26T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice (in support of Calpers' Demurrer to Second Amended Petition)
Date: 2021-03-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC)))
Date: 2021-07-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer))
Date: 2021-09-30T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore (Marco Neilly, CSR# 13564)
Date: 2021-09-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference Re: Discovery))
Date: 2021-10-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC)))
Date: 2022-01-05T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration of Brian Olney in Support of Petitioners' Objection and Motion to Strike)
Date: 2021-09-27T00:00:00Order (Overruling Defendants' Demurrer to Petitioners' Third Amended Petition for Writ of Mandate)
Date: 2021-09-30T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.