Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Jackson Jerry, filed a(n) Intentional Torts - Torts case represented by Andrews Brian, against Brast Inc., The Viole' Family Llc A Limited Partnership, Tobius Co. Ltd A California Corporation, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts with Marc D. Gross presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMarc D. Gross Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 25, 2019 |
CategoryCivil Rights/Discrimination (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedSeptember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeIntentional Torts |
Case Cycle Time161 days |
Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: November 25, 2019Complaint
Date: November 25, 2019Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: November 25, 2019Complaint
Date: 2019-11-25T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: April 29, 2020Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2019-11-25T00:00:00Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations
Date: April 24, 2020Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: April 24, 2020Request for Dismissal
Date: April 30, 2020Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2019-11-26T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: 2020-03-18T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2019-11-25T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2020-03-18T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
Date: 2019-11-26T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.