Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Porsche Financial Services Inc. Dba Lamborghini Financial Services, Porsche Leasing Ltd., filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Miller Stacey Ann, against Aig Leasing Llc, Penae Henry Penzi, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts with Marc D. Gross presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMarc D. Gross Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 18, 2019 |
CategoryCollections Case - Seller Plaintiff (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedSeptember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Case Cycle Time156 days |
Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: November 18, 2019Complaint
Date: November 18, 2019Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: November 18, 2019Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2019-11-18T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2019-11-18T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2019-11-18T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2019-11-18T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2019-11-18T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: January 21, 2020Request for Dismissal
Date: April 22, 2020Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: December 19, 2019For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.