Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Bank Of America N.A., filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Zide Flint C, against Sorenson Laura Mae, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts with Marc D. Gross presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMarc D. Gross Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 18, 2019 |
CategoryOther Promissory Note/Collections Case (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedSeptember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Case Cycle Time85 days |
Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: November 18, 2019Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: November 18, 2019Declaration - DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS
Date: November 18, 2019Complaint
Date: November 18, 2019Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: November 18, 2019Declaration - DECLARATION OF NON-SERVICE
Date: December 02, 2019Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: January 22, 2020Declaration - DECLARATION OF NON SERVICE
Date: December 02, 2019Case Management Statement
Date: February 04, 2020Request for Dismissal
Date: February 05, 2020Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2019-11-18T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2019-11-18T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2019-11-18T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: February 05, 2020Complaint
Date: 2019-11-18T00:00:00Declaration (of Non Service)
Date: 2019-12-02T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: January 22, 2020Declaration ( of Non-Military Status)
Date: 2019-11-18T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: February 04, 2020Declaration (of Non-Service)
Date: 2019-12-02T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.