Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Xxx Jenney Aka Xxx Xxx Aka Xxxxxxxx Xxx Aka Xxxxxxxxxxxx Aka Ms. Xxxx Aka Xxxx Aka Xxxx Xxxxx Xxx Aka Xxxxx Xxxx Aka Xxxx Xxx Aka Xxxxx Aka Jenney Xxxxx Aka Jenney Xxxx Xxx Aka Xxxxx Xxxxx Xxx Aka Xxxxx Xxxx Aka Xxxx Xxxxx Aka Jenney H. Xxx, Murrey Stewart Lucas, filed a(n) Intentional Torts - Torts case against Herran Chase Aka Chase Hern, Xxx Jenney Aka Xxx Xxx Aka Xxxxxxxx Xxx, Xxx Jenney Aka Xxx Xxx Aka Xxxxxxxx Xxx Aka Xxxxxxxxxxxx Aka Ms. Xxxx Aka Xxxx Aka Xxxx Xxxxx Xxx Aka Xxxxx Xxxx Aka Xxxx Xxx Aka Xxxxx Aka Jenney Xxxxx Aka Jenney Xxxx Xxx Aka Xxxxx Xxxxx Xxx Aka Xxxxx Xxxx Aka Xxxx Xxxxx Aka Jenney H. Xxx, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Santa Monica with Mark A. Young presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMark A. Young Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 23, 2019 |
CategoryCivil Rights/Discrimination (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedSeptember 14, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeIntentional Torts |
Filing Court HouseSanta Monica |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: March 23, 2022Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-10-23T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by: Jenney xxx (Defendant)
Date: 2019-12-11T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Stewart Lucas Murrey (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-10-23T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not anti-SLAPP) - without Demurrer; Filed by: Jenney xxx (Defendant)
Date: 2019-12-11T00:00:00Summons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-10-23T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-10-23T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Plaintiff's Reply; Filed by: Stewart Lucas Murrey (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-14T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Motion for Protective Order; Filed by: Jenney xxx (Defendant)
Date: 2020-09-29T00:00:00Informal Discovery Conference Bi-Party Joint Report; Filed by:
Date: 2020-10-06T00:00:00Complaint; Filed by: Stewart Lucas Murrey (Plaintiff); As to: Jenney xxx (Defendant)
Date: 2019-10-23T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Jenney xxx (Defendant)
Date: 2019-12-11T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Jenney xxx (Defendant)
Date: 2019-12-09T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Stewart Lucas Murrey (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-19T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-07-01T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike; Filed by: Jenney xxx (Defendant)
Date: 2019-12-11T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Jenney xxx (Defendant)
Date: 2021-02-25T00:00:00Motion re: for the Recusal of the Honorable Mark D. Young; Filed by: Stewart Lucas Murrey (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-25T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10); Filed by: Jenney xxx (Defendant)
Date: 2021-05-11T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Jenney xxx (Defendant)
Date: 2021-05-11T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Jenney xxx (Defendant)
Date: 2020-04-02T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Stewart Lucas Murrey (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-04-17T00:00:00Notice of Posting Jury Fees; Filed by: Stewart Lucas Murrey (Plaintiff); As to: Jenney xxx (Defendant)
Date: 2021-03-16T00:00:00Motion for Protective Order; Filed by: Jenney xxx (Defendant)
Date: 2020-09-29T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-10-07T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-01-05T00:00:00Response TO COURT'S ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE; Filed by: Jenney xxx (Defendant)
Date: 2022-04-25T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not initial pleading); Filed by: Jenney xxx (Defendant)
Date: 2021-05-11T00:00:00Declaration IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER; Filed by: Jenney xxx (Defendant)
Date: 2021-05-11T00:00:00Motion to Quash; Filed by: Jenney xxx (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2022-10-03T00:00:00Reply in support of plaintiff's motion to recuse judge Young; Filed by: Stewart Lucas Murrey (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-06-15T00:00:00Reply sur-reply; Filed by: Jenney xxx (Defendant)
Date: 2021-06-07T00:00:00Opposition to Motion to Quash; Filed by: Jenney xxx (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2022-01-24T00:00:00Declaration of Demurring Party Regarding Meet and Confer; Filed by: Jenney xxx (Defendant)
Date: 2022-05-31T00:00:00Notice of Related Case; Filed by: Stewart Lucas Murrey (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-10-01T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Appearance Case Review) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-04-15T00:00:00Declaration In Support of Motion; Filed by: Stewart Lucas Murrey (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-05-17T00:00:00Reply In Support of Protective Order; Filed by: Jenney xxx (Defendant)
Date: 2021-02-23T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: Jenney xxx (Defendant); As to: Stewart Lucas Murrey (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-03-02T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Nunc Pro Tunc Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-03-24T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-03-23T00:00:00Reply in Support of Demurrer to Plaintiff's SAC; Filed by: Jenney xxx (Defendant)
Date: 2022-04-25T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Stewart Lucas Murrey (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-12-09T00:00:00Opposition to Motion for protective order; Filed by: Stewart Lucas Murrey (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-02-19T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: Stewart Lucas Murrey (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2022-10-25T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10); Filed by: Stewart Lucas Murrey (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-10-25T00:00:00Reply to xxx's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Strike; Filed by: Stewart Lucas Murrey (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-10-03T00:00:00Declaration In Support of Demurrer and Motion to Strike; Filed by: Jenney xxx (Defendant)
Date: 2022-01-05T00:00:00Order Striking Statement of Disqualification; Verified Answer; Filed by:
Date: 2021-03-03T00:00:00Notice OF ERRATA; Filed by: Jenney xxx (Defendant); As to: Jenney xxx (Defendant)
Date: 2021-02-26T00:00:00Reply SUR-REPLY; Filed by: Jenney xxx (Defendant)
Date: 2021-06-07T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Stewart Lucas Murrey (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-06-10T00:00:00Response TO STEWART LUCAS MURREY'S REPLY; Filed by: Jenney xxx (Defendant)
Date: 2021-06-16T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-10-21T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-11-30T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not anti-SLAPP) - without Demurrer; Filed by: Jenney xxx (Defendant)
Date: 2022-02-08T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not initial pleading); Filed by: Jenney xxx (Defendant)
Date: 2022-06-28T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Plaintiff's Reply; Filed by: Stewart Lucas Murrey (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2022-04-26T00:00:00Declaration of Plaintiff Dr. Murrey; Filed by: Stewart Lucas Murrey (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-10-03T00:00:00Motion to Quash Service of Summons; Filed by: Stewart Lucas Murrey (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-10-25T00:00:00Response To Order To Show Cause; Filed by: Stewart Lucas Murrey (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-04-25T00:00:00Declaration RE: CRC RULE 3.1324; Filed by: Stewart Lucas Murrey (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-05-17T00:00:00Declaration of Demurring Party Regarding Meet and Confer; Filed by: Jenney xxx (Defendant)
Date: 2022-07-01T00:00:00Reply to Response to Order to Show to Show Cause; Filed by: Stewart Lucas Murrey (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2022-04-26T00:00:00Declaration In Support of Demurrer; Filed by: Jenney xxx (Defendant)
Date: 2022-02-07T00:00:00Notice of Motion; Filed by: Stewart Lucas Murrey (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-10-25T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not initial pleading); Filed by: Stewart Lucas Murrey (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-06-21T00:00:00Declaration of Dr. Murrey; Filed by: Stewart Lucas Murrey (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-02-03T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-03-10T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: Jenney xxx (Defendant)
Date: 2023-01-11T00:00:00Reply Supplemental Reply to xxx's Sur-Reply; Filed by: Stewart Lucas Murrey (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-02-06T00:00:00Declaration of Plaintiff Dr. Murrey; Filed by: Stewart Lucas Murrey (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-01-12T00:00:00Declaration of Dr. Murrey; Filed by: Stewart Lucas Murrey (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2023-02-10T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Stewart Lucas Murrey (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2023-02-10T00:00:00Reply Sur-Reply; Filed by: Jenney xxx (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2023-02-06T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Stewart Lucas Murrey (Plaintiff)
Date: July 10, 2023Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10); Filed by: Jenney xxx (Defendant)
Date: 2022-02-07T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not initial pleading); Filed by: Jenney xxx (Defendant)
Date: 2022-02-07T00:00:00Motion for Leave To File Second Amended Complaint; Filed by: Stewart Lucas Murrey (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-11-12T00:00:00Motion for Leave to Amend to File Fourth Amended Complaint; Filed by: Stewart Lucas Murrey (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-05-17T00:00:00Reply to xxx's Opposition to Plaintiff's Demurrer; Filed by: Stewart Lucas Murrey (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-10-03T00:00:00Supplemental Declaration ERRATA FILING; Filed by: Jenney xxx (Defendant)
Date: 2022-02-08T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10); Filed by: Stewart Lucas Murrey (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-06-21T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Jenney xxx (Defendant)
Date: 2022-02-07T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Stewart Lucas Murrey (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-10-25T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10); Filed by: Jenney xxx (Defendant)
Date: 2022-06-28T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2019-10-23T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2021-03-02T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2019-12-11T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
Date: 2019-12-09T00:00:00Declaration (in Support of Motion for Protective Order)
Date: 2020-09-29T00:00:00Reply (to Opposition to Motion for Further Responses to Form Interrogatories)
Date: 2020-12-14T00:00:00Declaration (of Plaintiff Dr. Murrey in support of Plaintiff's First amended Complaint)
Date: 2021-03-15T00:00:00Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses
Date: 2020-11-13T00:00:00Motion re: (for the Recusal of the Honorable Mark D. Young)
Date: 2021-01-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for an Order Restraining Defe...))
Date: 2021-01-15T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of )
Date: 2020-10-07T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of )
Date: 2020-07-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Protective Order; Hearing on Motion to ...))
Date: 2021-03-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review))
Date: 2020-04-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-07-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-10-07T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2019-10-23T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2019-10-23T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Hearing on Motion for Protective Order; Hearing on Motion to ...) of )
Date: 2021-03-04T00:00:00Reply (in support of Motion to Compel further responses to Special interrogatories)
Date: 2021-02-25T00:00:00Amended Complaint ( (1st))
Date: 2021-02-25T00:00:00Declaration (In Support of Defendant's Opposition to Motion to Compel Special Interrogatories)
Date: 2021-02-22T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2019-10-23T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not anti-SLAPP) - without Demurrer
Date: 2019-12-11T00:00:00Reply (In Support of Protective Order)
Date: 2021-02-23T00:00:00Opposition (to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Special Interrogatories Set One)
Date: 2021-02-19T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2021-03-04T00:00:00Notice of Related Case
Date: 2020-10-01T00:00:00Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses (to Form Interrogatories)
Date: 2021-02-23T00:00:00Notice (OF ERRATA)
Date: 2021-02-26T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)
Date: 2021-05-11T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-04-17T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike
Date: 2019-12-11T00:00:00Motion to Compel (Further Responses to Plaintiff's Request for Production of Documents (Set One))
Date: 2021-02-23T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2019-12-11T00:00:00Notice (of hearing on Demurrer with Motion to strike)
Date: 2019-12-11T00:00:00Declaration (in Support of Plaintiff's Reply)
Date: 2020-12-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses To Fo...))
Date: 2020-12-18T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([Order Striking Statement of Disqualification; Verified Answer])
Date: 2021-03-03T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review) of )
Date: 2020-04-15T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-01-19T00:00:00Declaration (IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER)
Date: 2021-05-11T00:00:00Declaration (of Jenney xxx in Support of Opposition to Motion to Compel Special Interrogatories)
Date: 2021-02-19T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-04-02T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities (in support of Demurrer to Plaintiff's Complaint)
Date: 2019-12-11T00:00:00Declaration (of Jenney xxx in support of Defendants Demurrer to complaint and Motion to Strike)
Date: 2019-12-11T00:00:00Opposition (to Motion for protective order)
Date: 2021-02-19T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2021-01-26T00:00:00Motion for Protective Order
Date: 2020-09-29T00:00:00Plaintiff Dr. Murrey's Opposition to Defendant Jenney xxx's Demurrer and Motion to Strike
Date: 2021-01-12T00:00:00Motion to Compel (Further Responses to Plaintiff's Request for Admissions)
Date: 2021-02-23T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: 2021-09-07T00:00:00Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses (To Form Interrogatories (Set One))
Date: 2020-08-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10); Cas...))
Date: 2021-01-26T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2019-10-23T00:00:00Declaration (of Plaintiff in support of First Amended Complaint)
Date: 2021-02-25T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2021-02-25T00:00:00Declaration (In Support of Motion to Compel Request for Production of Documents)
Date: 2021-02-25T00:00:00Reply (sur-reply)
Date: 2021-06-07T00:00:00Motion to Quash Service of Summons
Date: 2021-10-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Compliance with this Court's Order))
Date: 2021-09-10T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2021-10-25T00:00:00Reply (in support of plaintiff's motion to recuse judge Young)
Date: 2021-06-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses to Fo...))
Date: 2021-04-16T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses to Fo...) of )
Date: 2021-04-16T00:00:00Motion to Strike
Date: 2021-10-25T00:00:00Declaration (In Support of Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Further Production of Documents)
Date: 2021-05-24T00:00:00Declaration (In Support of Extension for Demurrer and Motion to Strike FAC)
Date: 2021-04-09T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2021-05-11T00:00:00Notice (of Posting Jury Fees)
Date: 2021-03-16T00:00:00Opposition (to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Further Responses to Request for Admissions)
Date: 2021-05-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses Respo...))
Date: 2021-04-23T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment
Date: 2021-10-21T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)
Date: 2021-05-11T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-06-10T00:00:00Response (TO STEWART LUCAS MURREY'S REPLY)
Date: 2021-06-16T00:00:00Cross-Complaint
Date: 2021-09-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses to Pl...))
Date: 2021-06-11T00:00:00Motion to Compel (with This Court's Discovery Order)
Date: 2021-07-28T00:00:00Opposition (To Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Further Production of Documents)
Date: 2021-05-24T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)
Date: 2021-10-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Compliance and for Terminating an...))
Date: 2021-12-09T00:00:00Amended Complaint ((1st))
Date: 2021-03-15T00:00:00Response (To Order To Show Cause)
Date: 2022-04-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses to re...))
Date: 2021-06-04T00:00:00Reply (SUR-REPLY)
Date: 2021-06-07T00:00:00Motion for Leave (To File Second Amended Complaint)
Date: 2021-11-12T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2021-12-09T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2021-11-30T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2022-02-08T00:00:00Supplemental Declaration (in Support of Plaintiff's Response to Order to Show Cause)
Date: 2022-04-27T00:00:00Reply (in support of motion to quash service of summons)
Date: 2022-01-24T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Nunc Pro Tunc Order) of )
Date: 2022-03-24T00:00:00Declaration (In Support of Demurrer and Motion to Strike)
Date: 2022-01-05T00:00:00Supplemental Declaration (ERRATA FILING)
Date: 2022-02-08T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)
Date: 2022-02-07T00:00:00Declaration (of Charles Newman in Support of Plaintiff's Response to Order to Show Cause)
Date: 2022-04-29T00:00:00Amended Cross-Complaint ( (1st))
Date: 2022-02-14T00:00:00Declaration (In Support of Demurrer)
Date: 2022-02-07T00:00:00Reply (in Support of Demurrer to Plaintiff's SAC)
Date: 2022-04-25T00:00:00Opposition (to Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File SAC)
Date: 2021-11-23T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)
Date: 2022-02-07T00:00:00Response (TO COURT'S ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE)
Date: 2022-04-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order))
Date: 2022-03-24T00:00:00Supplemental Declaration (of Plaintiff Dr Murrey Re: CRC RULE 3.1324)
Date: 2021-11-12T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2022-02-07T00:00:00Declaration (of Charles Newman in support of Plaintiff's response to Order To Show Cause)
Date: 2022-04-29T00:00:00Reply (to Response to Order to Show to Show Cause)
Date: 2022-04-26T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not anti-SLAPP) - without Demurrer
Date: 2022-02-08T00:00:00Declaration (OF DEFENDANT IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE)
Date: 2022-04-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Quash Service of Summons))
Date: 2022-02-01T00:00:00Declaration (in Support of Plaintiff's Reply)
Date: 2022-04-26T00:00:00Opposition (to Motion to Quash)
Date: 2022-01-24T00:00:00Declaration (of Witness in Support of Plaintiff's Response to Order to Show Cause)
Date: 2022-04-28T00:00:00Declaration (of Dr. Murrey in Support of Response to Order to Show Cause)
Date: 2022-04-25T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of )
Date: 2022-03-23T00:00:00Opposition (to xxx's Demurrer and Request for Judicial Notice)
Date: 2022-04-18T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
Date: 2019-12-09T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2019-10-23T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities (in support of Demurrer to Plaintiff's Complaint)
Date: 2019-12-11T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2019-12-11T00:00:00Declaration (of Jenney xxx in support of Defendants Demurrer to complaint and Motion to Strike)
Date: 2019-12-11T00:00:00Notice (of hearing on Demurrer with Motion to strike)
Date: 2019-12-11T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review) of 04/15/2020)
Date: 2020-04-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-07-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review))
Date: 2020-04-15T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 07/01/2020)
Date: 2020-07-01T00:00:00Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses (To Form Interrogatories (Set One))
Date: 2020-08-28T00:00:00Declaration (in Support of Motion for Protective Order)
Date: 2020-09-29T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 10/07/2020)
Date: 2020-10-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-10-07T00:00:00Reply (to Opposition to Motion for Further Responses to Form Interrogatories)
Date: 2020-12-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses To Fo...))
Date: 2020-12-18T00:00:00Declaration (in Support of Plaintiff's Reply)
Date: 2020-12-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for an Order Restraining Defe...))
Date: 2021-01-15T00:00:00Motion re: (for the Recusal of the Honorable Mark D. Young)
Date: 2021-01-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10); Cas...))
Date: 2021-01-26T00:00:00Declaration (of Jenney xxx in Support of Opposition to Motion to Compel Special Interrogatories)
Date: 2021-02-19T00:00:00Opposition (to Motion for protective order)
Date: 2021-02-19T00:00:00Opposition (to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Special Interrogatories Set One)
Date: 2021-02-19T00:00:00Motion to Compel (Further Responses to Plaintiff's Request for Admissions)
Date: 2021-02-23T00:00:00Declaration (In Support of Defendant's Opposition to Motion to Compel Special Interrogatories)
Date: 2021-02-22T00:00:00Reply (In Support of Protective Order)
Date: 2021-02-23T00:00:00Motion to Compel (Further Responses to Plaintiff's Request for Production of Documents (Set One))
Date: 2021-02-23T00:00:00Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses (to Form Interrogatories)
Date: 2021-02-23T00:00:00Declaration (of Plaintiff in support of First Amended Complaint)
Date: 2021-02-25T00:00:00Reply (in support of Motion to Compel further responses to Special interrogatories)
Date: 2021-02-25T00:00:00Amended Complaint ( (1st))
Date: 2021-02-25T00:00:00Declaration (In Support of Motion to Compel Request for Production of Documents)
Date: 2021-02-25T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([Order Striking Statement of Disqualification; Verified Answer])
Date: 2021-03-03T00:00:00Notice (OF ERRATA)
Date: 2021-02-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Protective Order; Hearing on Motion to ...))
Date: 2021-03-04T00:00:00Amended Complaint ((1st))
Date: 2021-03-15T00:00:00Declaration (of Plaintiff Dr. Murrey in support of Plaintiff's First amended Complaint)
Date: 2021-03-15T00:00:00Declaration (In Support of Extension for Demurrer and Motion to Strike FAC)
Date: 2021-04-09T00:00:00Notice (of Posting Jury Fees)
Date: 2021-03-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses to Fo...))
Date: 2021-04-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses Respo...))
Date: 2021-04-23T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)
Date: 2021-05-11T00:00:00Declaration (IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER)
Date: 2021-05-11T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)
Date: 2021-05-11T00:00:00Opposition (To Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Further Production of Documents)
Date: 2021-05-24T00:00:00Declaration (In Support of Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Further Production of Documents)
Date: 2021-05-24T00:00:00Opposition (to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Further Responses to Request for Admissions)
Date: 2021-05-24T00:00:00Reply (SUR-REPLY)
Date: 2021-06-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses to re...))
Date: 2021-06-04T00:00:00Reply (sur-reply)
Date: 2021-06-07T00:00:00Response (TO STEWART LUCAS MURREY'S REPLY)
Date: 2021-06-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses to Pl...))
Date: 2021-06-11T00:00:00Reply (in support of plaintiff's motion to recuse judge Young)
Date: 2021-06-15T00:00:00Motion to Compel (with This Court's Discovery Order)
Date: 2021-07-28T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: 2021-09-07T00:00:00Motion for Leave (To File Second Amended Complaint)
Date: 2021-11-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Compliance with this Court's Order))
Date: 2021-09-10T00:00:00Supplemental Declaration (of Plaintiff Dr Murrey Re: CRC RULE 3.1324)
Date: 2021-11-12T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)
Date: 2021-10-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Compliance and for Terminating an...))
Date: 2021-12-09T00:00:00Opposition (to Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File SAC)
Date: 2021-11-23T00:00:00Declaration (In Support of Demurrer and Motion to Strike)
Date: 2022-01-05T00:00:00Opposition (to Motion to Quash)
Date: 2022-01-24T00:00:00Reply (in support of motion to quash service of summons)
Date: 2022-01-24T00:00:00Motion for Sanctions
Date: 2021-06-22T00:00:00Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses
Date: 2020-08-28T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.