Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
National Collegiate Student Loan Trust 2004-2 A Delaware Statutory Trusts, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Simonson Todd C, against Cuevas Edina Aka Edina M Cuevas, Cuevas Edith, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Santa Monica Courthouse with Mark A. Young presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMark A. Young Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateOctober 21, 2019 |
CategoryOther Promissory Note/Collections Case (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Filing Court HouseSanta Monica Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Case Cycle Time253 days |
Complaint
Date: October 21, 2019Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: October 21, 2019Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: October 21, 2019Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2019-10-21T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2019-10-21T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2019-10-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review))
Date: April 15, 2020Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2019-10-21T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review) of 04/15/2020)
Date: April 15, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: June 08, 2020Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2019-10-22T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.