Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
American Express National Bank Fka American Express Centurion Bank, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Esq. Lina, Slinsky Lourdes R., against Cassalia An Individual Pasquale, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Santa Monica Courthouse with Elaine W. Mandel presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeElaine W. Mandel Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateOctober 17, 2019 |
CategoryOther Promissory Note/Collections Case (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Filing Court HouseSanta Monica Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Case Cycle Time160 days |
Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: October 17, 2019Complaint
Date: October 17, 2019Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: October 17, 2019Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: October 18, 2019Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: March 20, 2020Substitution of Attorney
Date: September 08, 2022Complaint Filed by American Express national bank (Plaintiff) PROCEEDINGS HELD
Date: 2019-10-17T00:00:00NON SERVICE REPORT Filed by American Express national bank (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-11-01T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: American Express national bank (Plaintiff)
Date: September 08, 2022Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-03-20T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by American Express national bank (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-10-17T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-10-17T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-10-17T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-10-18T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed by American Express national bank (Plaintiff)
Date: September 08, 2022Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-10-18T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-03-20T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by American Express national bank (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-10-17T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2019-10-18T00:00:00NON SERVICE REPORT
Date: 2019-11-01T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2019-10-17T00:00:00Stipulation - No Order (STIPULATION FOR CONDITIONAL ENTRY OF JUDGMENT)
Date: 2020-03-13T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2019-10-17T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2019-10-17T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2020-03-20T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2019-10-17T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.