Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Wurm Mark, filed a(n) General Insurance - Insurance case against Big Daddy Foods Inc, Parker Debby, Parker Jamie, represented by Miller Richard T, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Santa Monica with Mark A. Young presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMark A. Young Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management252 days |
Filing DateOctober 17, 2019 |
CategoryOther Contract Dispute (Not Breach/Insurance/Fraud/Negligence) (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Insurance |
|
Filing Court HouseSanta Monica |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Complaint
Date: October 17, 2019Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: October 17, 2019Default entered as to Big Daddy Foods, Inc; On the Complaint filed by Mark Wurm on
Date: 2019-12-06T00:00:00Default entered as to Debby Parker; On the Complaint filed by Mark Wurm on
Date: 2019-12-06T00:00:00Summons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-10-17T00:00:00Default entered as to Jamie Parker; On the Complaint filed by Mark Wurm on
Date: 2019-12-06T00:00:00Declaration of soo jeong lee Re: diligence re service; Filed by: Mark Wurm (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-12-06T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-03-19T00:00:00Declaration (of SOO JEONG LEE RE: Diligence Re Service) Filed by Mark Wurm (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-12-06T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-10-17T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Mark Wurm (Plaintiff)
Date: October 19, 2022Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Mark Wurm (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-10-17T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-10-17T00:00:00Declaration of SOO JEONG LEE RE: Diligence Re Service; Filed by: Mark Wurm (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-12-06T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-08-30T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-10-17T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-10-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Default (CCP 473.5))) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-01-21T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment ((Debbie Parker)) Filed by Mark Wurm (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-12-06T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-08-30T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-03-19T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment ((Big Daddy Foods Inc.)) Filed by Mark Wurm (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-12-06T00:00:00Declaration (of soo jeong lee Re: diligence re service) Filed by Mark Wurm (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-12-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal)) Filed by Clerk
Date: October 18, 2022Proof of Service by Substituted Service Filed by Mark Wurm (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-12-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-08-30T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment ((Jamie Parker)) Filed by Mark Wurm (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-12-06T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Mark Wurm (Plaintiff) PROCEEDINGS HELD
Date: 2019-10-17T00:00:00On the Complaint filed by Mark Wurm on , Default entered on , Vacated - .
Date: 2021-02-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-06-25T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by Mark Wurm (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-10-17T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-10-17T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Mark Wurm (Plaintiff)
Date: October 19, 2022Proof of Personal Service Filed by Mark Wurm (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-12-06T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2019-10-17T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2019-10-17T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment ((Debbie Parker))
Date: 2019-12-06T00:00:00Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Default
Date: 2020-07-28T00:00:00Declaration (of SOO JEONG LEE RE: Diligence Re Service)
Date: 2019-12-06T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2019-10-17T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment ((Jamie Parker))
Date: 2019-12-06T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2019-12-06T00:00:00General Denial
Date: 2020-04-30T00:00:00Declaration (of soo jeong lee Re: diligence re service)
Date: 2019-12-06T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment ((Big Daddy Foods Inc.))
Date: 2019-12-06T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-05-20T00:00:00Notice (of Non-Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Vacate Default and Request for Attorney Fees)
Date: 2021-01-15T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2020-03-19T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2019-12-06T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2019-10-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2020-06-25T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.