Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Cbobanna Inc. Dba Olympic Coach Craft, Los Angeles Federal Credit Union, filed a(n) Civil case represented by Anaya Alana B, against Cbobanna Inc. Dba Olympic Coach Craft, represented by Mass Christopher L, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Santa Monica with Elaine W. Mandel presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeElaine W. Mandel Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 09, 2019 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedOctober 17, 2023 |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions257 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseSanta Monica |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-10-09T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-01-31T00:00:00Default entered as to Cbobanna, Inc.,; On the Complaint filed by Los Angeles Federal Credit Union on
Date: 2019-11-26T00:00:00Motion to Quash Service of Summons; Filed by: Cbobanna, Inc., (Defendant)
Date: 2020-09-18T00:00:00On the Complaint filed by Los Angeles Federal Credit Union on , Default entered on , Vacated - .
Date: 2020-10-29T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-10-08T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: Cbobanna, Inc., (Defendant); As to: Los Angeles Federal Credit Union (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-10-22T00:00:00Declaration of John Weldon in Support of Motion; Filed by: Cbobanna, Inc., (Defendant)
Date: 2020-09-18T00:00:00Notice of Settlement; Filed by: Los Angeles Federal Credit Union (Plaintiff); Vacate Future Dates: No
Date: 2021-01-19T00:00:00Declaration of ALANA B. ANAYA RE ATTORNEYS' FEES; Filed by: Los Angeles Federal Credit Union (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-11-26T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-10-09T00:00:00Default entered as to Cbobanna, Inc.,; On the Complaint filed by Los Angeles Federal Credit Union on
Date: 2019-11-18T00:00:00Complaint; Filed by: Los Angeles Federal Credit Union (Plaintiff); As to: Cbobanna, Inc., (Defendant)
Date: 2019-10-09T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Los Angeles Federal Credit Union (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-03-16T00:00:00Declaration of Christopher L. Mass, Esq. in Support of Motion; Filed by: Cbobanna, Inc., (Defendant)
Date: 2020-09-18T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Cbobanna, Inc., (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2020-12-08T00:00:00Declaration of Anna Hyung in Support of Motion; Filed by: Cbobanna, Inc., (Defendant)
Date: 2020-09-18T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-04-24T00:00:00Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-04-24T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order; Filed by: Clerk; As to: Does: 1-50
Date: 2020-06-22T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-03-20T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-01-20T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-06-22T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2020-03-20T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2019-10-09T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2019-10-09T00:00:00Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment
Date: 2019-11-26T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2020-04-24T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2019-10-09T00:00:00Writ of Execution ((Los Angeles))
Date: 2020-07-16T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2019-10-09T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2020-10-08T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2019-10-09T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-10-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Quash Service of Summons and Set Aside D...))
Date: 2020-10-29T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-03-16T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2019-11-26T00:00:00Declaration (of Anna Hyung in Support of Motion)
Date: 2020-09-18T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-11-30T00:00:00Declaration (of Christopher L. Mass, Esq. in Support of Motion)
Date: 2020-09-18T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2019-11-18T00:00:00Declaration (of John Weldon in Support of Motion)
Date: 2020-09-18T00:00:00Summons (on Cross-Complaint)
Date: 2020-10-30T00:00:00Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations
Date: 2020-04-24T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2019-11-26T00:00:00Cross-Complaint (of Cbabanna, Inc.)
Date: 2020-10-30T00:00:00Declaration (of ALANA B. ANAYA RE ATTORNEYS' FEES)
Date: 2019-11-26T00:00:00Default Judgment
Date: 2020-06-22T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2019-10-22T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order
Date: 2020-06-22T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2020-01-31T00:00:00Motion to Quash Service of Summons
Date: 2020-09-18T00:00:00Notice (Entry of Judgment)
Date: 2020-06-25T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.