Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Curry Andre, filed a(n) Wrongful Termination - Labor and Employment case represented by Groeneveld Greg R, Guha Ranojoy, against Burton Alan R, Northeast Protective Services Inc., Widder Frank, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Santa Monica with Mark A. Young presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMark A. Young Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management180 days |
Filing DateOctober 04, 2019 |
CategoryWrongful Termination (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeWrongful Termination |
|
Filing Court HouseSanta Monica |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Complaint; Filed by: Andre Curry (Plaintiff); As to: Northeast Protective Services, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-10-04T00:00:00Summons on Second Amended Cross-Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Andre Curry (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-02-19T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-10-04T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-10-08T00:00:00Summons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Andre Curry (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-10-09T00:00:00Association of Attorney; Filed by: Andre Curry (Plaintiff)
Date: July 28, 2022Updated -- Default Judgment: Filed By: Andre Curry (Plaintiff); Result: Granted; Result Date:
Date: 2020-12-11T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Appearance Case Review) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-03-18T00:00:00Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint; Filed by: Andre Curry (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-01-08T00:00:00Amended Complaint; Filed by: Andre Curry (Plaintiff); As to: Andre Curry (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-10-09T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-10-16T00:00:00Summary of the Case; Filed by: Andre Curry (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-10-16T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by: Andre Curry (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-10-16T00:00:00Amended Cross-Complaint (Second); Filed by: Andre Curry (Defendant)
Date: 2020-02-14T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Andre Curry (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-06-30T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: October 04, 2019Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: October 04, 2019Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: October 08, 2019Amended Complaint
Date: October 09, 2019Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: October 09, 2019Proof of Personal Service
Date: November 12, 2019Motion for Leave - MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: January 08, 2020Proof of Personal Service
Date: February 13, 2020Other - - OTHER - SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: February 14, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT)
Date: February 14, 2020Summons - SUMMONS ON SECOND AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT
Date: February 19, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)
Date: March 18, 2020Proof of Personal Service
Date: April 07, 2020Proof of Personal Service
Date: April 27, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: July 02, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL / ENTRY OF JUDGMENT)
Date: October 15, 2020Summary of the Case
Date: October 16, 2020Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment
Date: October 16, 2020Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: October 16, 2020Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: October 16, 2020Default Judgment
Date: December 11, 2020Association of Attorney
Date: July 28, 2022Writ of Execution - WRIT OF EXECUTION (LOS ANGELES)
Date: August 02, 2022Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: May 19, 2023Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review))
Date: 2020-03-18T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2019-10-08T00:00:00Summons (on Second Amended Cross-Complaint)
Date: 2020-02-19T00:00:00Amended Complaint ((First))
Date: 2019-10-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Leave TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT))
Date: 2020-02-14T00:00:00Motion for Leave (to File Second Amended Complaint)
Date: 2020-01-08T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-06-30T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2019-11-12T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2019-10-04T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2019-10-04T00:00:00Summons (on First Amended Complaint)
Date: 2019-10-09T00:00:00Amended Complaint ((Second))
Date: 2020-02-14T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2019-10-04T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2020-04-27T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2020-04-07T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2020-02-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2020-07-02T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review) of 03/18/2020)
Date: 2020-03-18T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.