Case Last Refreshed: 20 hours ago
filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts Superior Court of California, County of Butte with Keithley, Clare presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKeithley, Clare Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 30, 2019 |
CategoryGuardianship Of Minor - Person Only |
Last RefreshedApril 23, 2024 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Filing Court HouseSuperior Court of California, County of Butte |
Notice of Returned Documents
Date: December 22, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 18, 2023 | Docket Event |
Review Hearing Annual Review Judge: Keithley, Clare |
|
April 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
Returned Mail Order Terminating Guardianship |
|
March 24, 2023 | Docket Event | Proof of Mailing | |
February 09, 2023 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
February 09, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order Terminating Guardianship-Supervision Terminated
Judge: Keithley, Clare |
|
February 09, 2023 | Docket Event |
Petition Hearing Mother's Petition to Terminiate Guardianship Judge: Keithley, Clare |
|
February 03, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
February 02, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice to Complete and Return Status Report | |
February 02, 2023 | Docket Event | Report and Recommendation re Termination | |
January 09, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Returned Documents |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.