Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Collison, Jack, filed a(n) General Probate - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Sterne, Colleen K presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSterne, Colleen K Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 26, 2019 |
CategoryProbate |
Last RefreshedMay 14, 2022 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Probate |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 18, 2021 | Tentative Ruling |
Nature of Proceedings: Petition for Approval of Settlement
Judge: Judge Colleen Sterne |
|
November 18, 2021 | Tentative Ruling |
Nature of Proceedings: Petition for Approval of Settlement Absent objection, the Settlement will be approved.
Judge: Judge Colleen Sterne |
|
October 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
Trial Confirmation Conference
Judge: Sterne, Colleen K |
|
October 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Report, Filed Status Report - HRG 10/18/21 |
|
August 05, 2021 | Tentative Ruling |
Nature of Proceedings: Case Management Conference Case Management Conference. Appearance required.
Judge: Judge Colleen Sterne |
|
August 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
Minute Order, Filed Trial Confirmation Conference confirmed for 10/18/21 at 11:30 AM in SB Dept. 5 |
|
August 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Sterne, Colleen K |
|
June 17, 2021 | Tentative Ruling |
Nature of Proceedings: Case Management Conference
Judge: Judge Colleen Sterne |
|
June 17, 2021 | Tentative Ruling |
Nature of Proceedings: Case Management Conference This matter is going to Mediation pursuant to Stipulation, and future dates have been calendared. No appearance is required.
Judge: Judge Colleen Sterne |
|
June 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Sterne, Colleen K |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.