Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Redey, Elizabeth A, filed a(n) Estate Administration - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Sterne, Colleen K presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSterne, Colleen K Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 25, 2019 |
CategoryDecedent'S Estate-Letters Of Administration |
Last RefreshedSeptember 29, 2021 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeEstate Administration |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 29, 2020 | Docket Event |
Minute Order, Filed -Case is Ordered Related to #19PR00339 |
|
March 11, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Related Case, Filed | |
December 23, 2019 | Docket Event |
Inventory & Appraisal, Filed - Supplemental |
|
November 05, 2019 | Docket Event |
Letters, Filed of Administration |
|
October 24, 2019 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Order, Filed to Vacate Letters and Issue New Letters of Administration |
|
October 15, 2019 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Application, Filed to Vacate Letters of Administration and Issue New Letters |
|
August 23, 2019 | Docket Event |
Letters, Filed of Administration - VACATED per Order filed 10/24/19 |
|
August 23, 2019 | Docket Event | Supervision Begins Appointment of Personal Representative | |
August 15, 2019 | Docket Event |
Surety Bond, Filed in the amount of $45,000.00 |
|
August 13, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order for Probate, Filed Appointing Administrator -HRG: 8/1/19 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.