Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
National Collegiate Student Loan Trust 2007-1 A Delaware Statutory Trusts, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Simonson Todd C, Simonson Todd Christopher, against Pigee Chrystally Aka Chrystallynn V Pigee Aka Chrystallynn V Pigee, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Norwalk with Margaret Miller Bernal presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMargaret Miller Bernal Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management120 days |
Filing DateOctober 21, 2019 |
CategoryOther Promissory Note/Collections Case (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Filing Court HouseNorwalk |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: October 21, 2019Complaint
Date: October 21, 2019Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: October 21, 2019Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-10-21T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-10-21T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-10-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: July 08, 2020Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-10-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order regarding advancing and continuing hearing set fo...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-04-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order modifying the hearing time for case management co...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-05-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-02-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2020-07-08T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2019-10-21T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2019-10-21T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2019-10-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order regarding advancing and continuing hearing set fo...))
Date: 2020-04-06T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2019-10-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order modifying the hearing time for case management co...))
Date: 2020-05-18T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2019-10-21T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-01-21T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-06-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2020-02-18T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.